Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2019 at 05:25:07 (UTC).

JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC VS LYNN A VOLANDE

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LYNN A VOLANDE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GRACIELA FREIXES. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8953

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GRACIELA FREIXES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES LLC

Defendant

VOLANDE LYNN A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERME LISA MELISSA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/20/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Declaration (name extension) - COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINAL

3/1/2018: Declaration (name extension) - COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINAL

Judgment

4/16/2018: Judgment

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/20/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/20/2017: Complaint

Request for Dismissal

3/1/2018: Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - VENUE

12/20/2017: Declaration (name extension) - VENUE

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

12/20/2017: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/1/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - CCP 1033

3/1/2018: Declaration (name extension) - CCP 1033

Proof of Personal Service

1/9/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - on Complaint

12/20/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/20/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

4/24/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

3/1/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Does: 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC against Defendant LYNN A VOLANDE, AN INDIVIDUAL on the Complaint filed by JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC on 12/20/2017 for the principal amount of $3,984.44 and costs of $246.00 for a total of $4,230.44.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: LYNN A VOLANDE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Default entered as to LYNN A VOLANDE; On the Complaint filed by JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC on 12/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • On the Complaint filed by JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC on 12/20/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • SUPPORT OF APPLICATION; Filed by: JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Declaration CCP 1033; Filed by: JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by: JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: LYNN A VOLANDE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Declaration Pursuant to 1033 CCP; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Graciela Freixes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Declaration VENUE; Filed by: JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less