This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2018 at 19:00:16 (UTC).

JESSICA LEE VS SANG D. KWON

Case Summary

On 08/31/2017 JESSICA LEE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SANG D KWON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DOUGLAS W. STERN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0108

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DOUGLAS W. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEE JESSICA

Harbor City, CA 90710

Defendant

KWON SANG D.

Gardena, CA 90247

 

Court Documents

(Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

1/25/2018: (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal continued) of 02/13/2018

2/13/2018: Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal continued) of 02/13/2018

(Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal continued)

2/13/2018: (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal continued)

Unknown

12/12/2017: Unknown

Unknown

12/27/2017: Unknown

Unknown

12/27/2017: Unknown

[Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment]

12/27/2017: [Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment]

Unknown

12/27/2017: Unknown

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/01/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

12/1/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/01/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

[Notice of Rejection]

11/9/2017: [Notice of Rejection]

Unknown

11/29/2017: Unknown

Unknown

9/29/2017: Unknown

Unknown

9/29/2017: Unknown

[Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

9/29/2017: [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

Unknown

9/22/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/31/2017: Unknown

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2018
  • Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal continued)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal continued) of 02/13/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Updated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Jessica Lee on 08/31/2017, judgment entered on 12/01/2017 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Jessica Lee on 08/31/2017, judgment entered on 12/01/2017 as to Sang D. Kwon is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • On the Court's own motion, Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 01/25/2018 at 10:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department 3 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 02/13/2018 10:30 AM at Department S03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Address for Sang D. Kwon (Defendant) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment; Filed by: Sang D. Kwon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Sang D. Kwon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2017
  • Notice of Rejection; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Sang D. Kwon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Pursuant to the request of defendant, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/13/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department S13 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party to 12/01/2017 08:30 AM at 12/01/2017 8:30 AM Non-Jury Trial in Department S13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Sang D. Kwon (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Notice of Postponement; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Sang D. Kwon (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/08/2017; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/13/2017 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Jessica Lee (Plaintiff); As to: Sang D. Kwon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Douglas W. Stern in Department S13 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less