This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/27/2021 at 00:21:15 (UTC).

JESSICA ADAMS VS YOEL FELIX DELGADO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/02/2019 JESSICA ADAMS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against YOEL FELIX DELGADO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7140

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADAMS JESSICA

Defendants

DELGADO YOEL FELIX

MURO FRANCISCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

MCKEON ROBERT GREGORY ESQ.

MCKEON ROBERT GREGORY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel ANSWERS TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION ...)

3/10/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel ANSWERS TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION ...)

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

3/12/2021: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Motion for Terminating Sanctions

8/3/2021: Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Motion for Terminating Sanctions

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Court's Order on Ex-Parte Application to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions and to Continue Trial

8/6/2021: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Court's Order on Ex-Parte Application to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions and to Continue Trial

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

8/10/2021: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

8/25/2021: Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Jury Trial; Ex-Parte Proceedings Filed by the Defendants to C...) of 08/25/2021

8/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Jury Trial; Ex-Parte Proceedings Filed by the Defendants to C...) of 08/25/2021

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel verified ans to form interrogatories, set one; [proposed] order

1/5/2021: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel verified ans to form interrogatories, set one; [proposed] order

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel verified ans to demand for identification and production of document, set one; [PROPOSED] Order

1/5/2021: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel verified ans to demand for identification and production of document, set one; [PROPOSED] Order

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application to continue fsc, trial, and all related dates; [proposed] order

1/8/2021: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application to continue fsc, trial, and all related dates; [proposed] order

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

1/14/2021: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue fsc, trial, and a...)

1/14/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue fsc, trial, and a...)

Answer - Answer

12/6/2019: Answer - Answer

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/2/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

8/2/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/2/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/2/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

8/2/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Jessica Adams on 08/02/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to CCP 581(b)(5)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Jury Trial; Ex-Parte Proceedings Filed by the Defendants to C...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Jury Trial; Ex-Parte Proceedings Filed by the Defendants to C...) of 08/25/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 08/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketEx-parte Ex-Parte Proceedings Filed by the Defendants to Continue Trial, FSC, and All Applicable Discovery Dates scheduled for 08/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 08/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions Filed by the Defendants Against Plaintiff Jessica Adams With Prejudice scheduled for 09/15/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application to Advance the 09/15/2021 Hearing Date on Defendants' Motion for Terminating Sanctions, or in the Alternative, to Continue Trial, FSC, and All Applicable Discovery dates: As To Parties changed from Yoel Felix Delgado (Defendant), Francisco Muro (Defendant) to Yoel Felix Delgado (Defendant), Francisco Muro (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 08/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Type changed from Non-Jury Trial to Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Yoel Felix Delgado (Defendant); Francisco Muro (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Yoel Felix Delgado (Defendant); Francisco Muro (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Yoel Felix Delgado (Defendant); Francisco Muro (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jessica Adams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jessica Adams (Plaintiff); As to: Yoel Felix Delgado (Defendant); Francisco Muro (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC07140    Hearing Date: March 10, 2021    Dept: 26

Adams v. Delgado, et al.

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION

(CCP §§ 2030.290, 2031.300)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Yoel Felix Delgado’s (1) Motion To Compel Responses To Form Interrogatories, Set One; and (2) Motion To Compel Responses To Demand For Production Of Documents, Set One are GRANTED. PLAINTIFF JESSICA ADAMS IS TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTION TO THE INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

ANALYSIS:

Defendant Yoel Felix Delgado (“Defendant Delgado”) propounded Form Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents on Plaintiff Jessica Adams (“Plaintiff”) on December 6, 2019. (Motions, McKeon Decl., Exh. A.) Following Plaintiff’s failure to provide timely responses, Defendant Delgado extended the deadline multiple times. (Id. at Exhs. B-C.) Following no response from Plaintiff, Defendant Delgado filed the instant (1) Motion To Compel Responses To Form Interrogatories, Set One; and (2) Motion To Compel Responses To Demand For Production Of Documents on January 5, 2021. To date, no opposition has been filed.

Based on Plaintiff’s failure to serve initial responses, the Motions to compel responses to interrogatories and request for production are granted. There is no requirement for a prior meet and confer effort before a motion to compel initial responses or deem admissions admitted can be filed. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290, 2031.300.) Further, the motion can be brought any time after the responding party fails to provide the responses. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290, 2031.300.) Based on the foregoing, Defendant Delgado is entitled to an order compelling Plaintiff to serve verified responses to the interrogatories and request for production without objections.

Defendant Yoel Felix Delgado’s (1) Motion To Compel Responses To Form Interrogatories, Set One; and (2) Motion To Compel Responses To Demand For Production Of Documents, Set One are GRANTED. PLAINTIFF JESSICA ADAMS IS TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTION TO THE INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

Moving party to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCKEON ROBERT GREGORY