This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2021 at 06:48:50 (UTC).

JERRY JACKSON VS SEA SALT POKE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/07/2018 JERRY JACKSON filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against SEA SALT POKE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3600

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACKSON JERRY

Defendants

SEA SALT POKE INC.

LENTON PROPERTIES INC.

SEA SALT POKE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHIN TED SANGDON

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/7/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

11/7/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/7/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

11/7/2018: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/7/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/8/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/8/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/8/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/5/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/05/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/05/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff); As to: Sea Salt Poke (Defendant); Service Date: 11/28/2018; Service Cost: 120.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff); As to: Sea Salt Poke Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 11/28/2018; Service Cost: 120.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff); As to: Lenton Properties Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 11/28/2018; Service Cost: 120.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff); As to: Sea Salt Poke (Defendant); Sea Salt Poke Inc. (Defendant); Lenton Properties Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Jerry Jackson on 11/07/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Jerry Jackson as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff); As to: Sea Salt Poke (Defendant); Sea Salt Poke Inc. (Defendant); Lenton Properties Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less