This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 14:57:46 (UTC).

JERRY JACKSON VS PINKBERRY

Case Summary

On 11/28/2017 JERRY JACKSON filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against PINKBERRY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4432

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACKSON JERRY

Defendants

PINKBERRY

G Q FRESH INC

TOLKIN COOPER F

TOLKIN JONATHAN A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHIN TED SANGDON

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

11/28/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/28/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

11/28/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint

11/28/2017: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/28/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

11/28/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/13/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/13/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/5/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/5/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/20/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/28/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff); As to: Pinkberry (Defendant); G Q Fresh Inc (Defendant); Jonathan A Tolkin (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Jerry Jackson on 11/28/2017, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Jerry Jackson as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff); As to: Pinkberry (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/17/2018; Service Cost: 120.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff); As to: Cooper F Tolkin (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/22/2018; Service Cost: 120.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff); As to: Jonathan A Tolkin (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/22/2015; Service Cost: 120.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff); As to: G Q Fresh Inc (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/09/2018; Service Cost: 120.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/28/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff); As to: Pinkberry (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Status Date changed from 12/01/2017 to 11/28/2017; Result Date changed from 12/01/2017 to 11/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Status Date changed from 12/01/2017 to 11/28/2017; Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GQ FRESH INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where PINKBERRY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHIN, TED S