This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2021 at 00:31:51 (UTC).

JERRY JACKSON VS MATCHA LOVE CHU, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/02/2018 JERRY JACKSON filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against MATCHA LOVE CHU,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3871

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACKSON JERRY

Defendants

CHU MATCHA LOVE

NORTH AMERICA INC

LENTON PROPERTIES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHIN TED SANGDON

888 Prospect St

La Jolla, CA 92037

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/2/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

11/2/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/2/2018: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

11/2/2018: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/2/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/2/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/8/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/8/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/8/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/27/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Non-Jury Trial) of 06/04/2020

6/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Non-Jury Trial) of 06/04/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Non-Jury Trial)

6/4/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment...)

5/24/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment...) of 05/24/2021

5/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment...) of 05/24/2021

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Jerry Jackson on 11/02/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment...) of 05/24/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment/Dismissal scheduled for 05/24/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 05/24/2021; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/05/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment/Dismissal scheduled for 05/24/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Non-Jury Trial) of 06/04/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/31/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 06/04/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff); As to: Matcha Love Chu (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Result Date: 11/02/2018; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Result Date changed from 03/08/2019 to 11/02/2018; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less