This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2021 at 07:00:45 (UTC).

JERRY JACKSON VS LE QUIPE CAFE AND SALAD BAR, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/09/2018 JERRY JACKSON filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against LE QUIPE CAFE AND SALAD BAR,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3950

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACKSON JERRY

Defendants

DIVAN AUTHENTIC PERSIAN CUISINE LLC

LE QUIPE CAFE AND SALAD BAR

LENTON PROPERTIES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHIN TED SANGDON

888 Prospect St

La Jolla, CA 92037

 

Court Documents

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/9/2018: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

11/9/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint - Complaint

11/9/2018: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/9/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/9/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/19/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/19/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/19/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 04/19/2019

4/19/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 04/19/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

4/19/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/1/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

9/23/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/23/2020

9/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/23/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment...) of 04/29/2021

4/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment...) of 04/29/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment...)

4/29/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment...)

Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

4/29/2021: Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Jerry Jackson on 11/09/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment...) of 04/29/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment/ Dismissal scheduled for 04/29/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 04/29/2021; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment/ Dismissal scheduled for 04/29/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/23/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/12/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 09/23/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 09/23/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/08/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff); As to: Le Quipe Cafe and Salad Bar (Defendant); Divan Authentic Persian Cuisine LLC (Defendant); Lenton Properties Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LENTON PROPERTIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHIN, TED S