*******3552
11/06/2018
Other
Civil Right - Other Civil Right
Los Angeles, California
JON R. TAKASUGI
JACKSON JERRY
EKE ENTERPRISE INC.
COCO FRESH TEA AND JUICE
LENTON PROPERTIES INC.
SHIN TED SANGDON
11/6/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
11/6/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
11/6/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint
11/6/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
11/6/2018: Complaint - Complaint
1/15/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
1/15/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
2/8/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service
4/19/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
4/19/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal Not Entered: Name Extension: Not Entered; As To Parties changed from Coco Fresh Tea and Juice (Defendant), Lenton Properties Inc. (Defendant), Eke Enterprise Inc. (Defendant) to Coco Fresh Tea and Juice (Defendant), Lenton Properties Inc. (Defendant), Eke Enterprise Inc. (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:1603874 resulted in empty message
[-] Read LessDocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:1603875 resulted in empty message
[-] Read LessDocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:1603876 resulted in empty message
[-] Read LessDocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/05/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/23/2019
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/23/2019
[-] Read LessDocketOn the Complaint filed by Jerry Jackson on 11/06/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Jerry Jackson
[-] Read LessDocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff); As to: Coco Fresh Tea and Juice (Defendant); Eke Enterprise Inc. (Defendant); Lenton Properties Inc. (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketOn the Complaint filed by Jerry Jackson on 11/06/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Jerry Jackson as to the entire action
[-] Read LessDocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff); As to: Coco Fresh Tea and Juice (Defendant); Eke Enterprise Inc. (Defendant); Lenton Properties Inc. (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff); As to: Coco Fresh Tea and Juice (Defendant); Service Date: 11/20/2018; Service Cost: 120.00; Service Cost Waived: No
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff); As to: Coco Fresh Tea and Juice (Defendant); Eke Enterprise Inc. (Defendant); Lenton Properties Inc. (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jerry Jackson (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse
[-] Read LessDocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/05/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94
[-] Read Less