Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/05/2021 at 21:53:20 (UTC).

JEREMY ROMERO, ET AL. VS CMC REALTY AND PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

Case Summary

On 06/12/2017 JEREMY ROMERO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CMC REALTY AND PROPERTY MANAGEMENT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5898

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROMERO SERENA

Brea, CA 92821

ROMERO JEREMY

Brea, CA 92821

Defendants

CMC REALTY AND PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

5318 E. 2Nd Street, #326,

Long Beach, CA 90803

BEIJING CMC LLC AKA CMC REALTY AND PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

5318 E. 2Nd Street, #326,

Long Beach, CA 90803

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 10/02/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

10/2/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 10/02/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

9/29/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

8/29/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 08/28/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

8/28/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 08/28/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

12/27/2017: Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

Other - (name extension) - EXHIBIT RECEIPT

10/6/2017: Other - (name extension) - EXHIBIT RECEIPT

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

10/2/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

10/2/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

9/29/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

8/28/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

8/29/2017: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

8/28/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

8/28/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/18/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

6/12/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/12/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

6/12/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketOther - EXHIBIT RECEIPT; Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- BEIJING CMC, LLC (Defendant): Organization Name changed from CMC Realty and Property Management to BEIJING CMC, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 10/02/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Serena Romero and Plaintiff Jeremy Romero against Defendant BEIJING CMC, LLC AKA CMC REALTY AND PROPERTY MANAGEMENT on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Jeremy Romero, et al. on 06/12/2017 for the principal amount of $289.30 and costs of $145.00 for a total of $434.30.; Other: This judgment also includes and encompasses all security deposit issues and related claims of all parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: CMC Realty and Property Management (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 09/29/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 09/29/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Serena Romero and Plaintiff Jeremy Romero against Defendant CMC Realty and Property Management on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Jeremy Romero, et al. on 06/12/2017 for the principal amount of $1,500.00 and costs of $145.00 for a total of $1,645.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jeremy Romero (Plaintiff); Serena Romero (Plaintiff); As to: CMC Realty and Property Management (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/01/2017; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: 1170614E1686 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170614E1686 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/28/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Jeremy Romero (Plaintiff); Serena Romero (Plaintiff); As to: CMC Realty and Property Management (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less