This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/09/2021 at 13:56:24 (UTC).

JENNIFER KING VS MARK CARTIER

Case Summary

On 05/27/2020 JENNIFER KING filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARK CARTIER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BEVERLY BOURNE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1458

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

BEVERLY BOURNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KING JENNIFER

Defendant

CARTIER MARK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FEINBERG LAURENCE JAY

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

5/27/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

6/17/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

6/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/6/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice OF REMOTE APPEARANCES AND EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL]

9/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice OF REMOTE APPEARANCES AND EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/17/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

11/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/17/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/17/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

11/17/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Proof of Service Not Plaintiffs / Defendants Claim - Proof of Service Not Plaintiffs / Defendants Claim Notice of continuance due to Covid-19

11/17/2020: Proof of Service Not Plaintiffs / Defendants Claim - Proof of Service Not Plaintiffs / Defendants Claim Notice of continuance due to Covid-19

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

3/26/2021: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

3/25/2021: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

3/25/2021: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Laurence Jay Feinberg Re Interest after Judgment

3/25/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Laurence Jay Feinberg Re Interest after Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

3/19/2021: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

3/19/2021: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection: As To Parties changed from Jennifer King (Plaintiff) to Jennifer King (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Jennifer King (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Jennifer King (Plaintiff); As to: Mark Cartier (Defendant); Interest: 320.42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Laurence Jay Feinberg Re Interest after Judgment; Filed by: Jennifer King (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Jennifer King (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection: As To Parties changed from Jennifer King (Plaintiff) to Jennifer King (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Jennifer King (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service Not Plaintiff?s / Defendant?s Claim Notice of continuance due to Covid-19; Filed by: As to: Mark Cartier (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice OF REMOTE APPEARANCES AND EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNotice OF REMOTE APPEARANCES AND EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Jennifer King (Plaintiff); Mark Cartier (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jennifer King (Plaintiff); As to: Mark Cartier (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/02/2020; Service Cost: 350.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/04/2020 at 10:00 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 11/17/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Jennifer King (Plaintiff); As to: Mark Cartier (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Beverly Bourne in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 09/04/2020 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEINBERG LAURENCE JAY