This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2019 at 17:08:07 (UTC).

JENKINS PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT VS JONES, TANICA N.

Case Summary

On 06/15/2012 JENKINS PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against JONES, TANICA N. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1203

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JENKINS PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CO. INC. - ASSIGNOR T

JENKINS PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CO. INC. - ASSIGNOR TRACO INVESTMENT CORP A DELAWARE CORPORATION DBA TRACORP - ASSIGNEE

Defendants

JONES TANICA N. SUED HEREIN AS JONES TANICA NICOLE

JONES TANICA N.

Assignee

BROWN BRADFORD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF GROSSMAN & MAHAN - LESLIE K. GROSSMAN

LAW OFFICES OF GROSSMAN & MAHAN - LESLIE K GROSSMAN ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GROSSMAN & MAHAN

GROSSMAN LESLIE K ESQ

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: INTEREST $3,145.78

3/29/2017: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: INTEREST $3,145.78

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

5/22/2017: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

12/28/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

1/17/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

6/4/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim) of 06/04/2019

6/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim) of 06/04/2019

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

6/5/2019: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: INTEREST $3,323.16

7/7/2017: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: INTEREST $3,323.16

Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim - JUDGMENT DEBTOR TANICA N. JONES SUED HEREIN AS TANICA NICOLE JONES

8/30/2017: Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim - JUDGMENT DEBTOR TANICA N. JONES SUED HEREIN AS TANICA NICOLE JONES

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim JUDGMENT DEBT...) of 10/17/2017

10/17/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim JUDGMENT DEBT...) of 10/17/2017

Minute Order - (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim JUDGMENT DEBT...)

10/17/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim JUDGMENT DEBT...)

Substitution of Attorney

10/17/2017: Substitution of Attorney

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim JUDGMENT DEBT...) of 05/24/2018

5/24/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim JUDGMENT DEBT...) of 05/24/2018

Minute Order - (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim JUDGMENT DEBT...)

5/24/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim JUDGMENT DEBT...)

Writ - Return

5/25/2018: Writ - Return

Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption - Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption

2/26/2019: Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption - Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

3/29/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2019
  • Hearingat 01:30 PM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 92 on [ln 7, col 15] with Document:12013600

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Partially Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 400.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Partially Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketHearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim scheduled for 10/02/2019 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim) of 06/04/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim scheduled for 06/04/2019 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 10/02/2019 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (JENKINS PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CO.) INC. - ASSIGNOR (TRACO INVESTMENT CORP) A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: TANICA N. JONES (Defendant); Costs: 714.05; Interest: 0.00; Service Date: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketHearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim scheduled for 06/04/2019 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY ON BEHALF OF ASSIGNEE , RECEIPT NO. X .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: INTEREST $3,145.78 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2013
  • Docket* CASE RENUMBERED FROM PAS12C01203 TO LAM12CP1203

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO (JONES, TANICA N.) SUED HEREIN AS (JONES, TANICA NICOLE) . DATE OF SERVICE WAS ON 07/18/12 . NO ENFORCEABLE EXECUTION TO ISSUE PRIOR TO 08/20/12 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. TOTAL JUDGMENT RENEWED IN THE SUM OF $ 6627.14. RN PAS526118021 . Filing Fee: 30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT STAYED UNTIL PROOF OF SERVICE IS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT HAVING BEEN FILED, ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER CASE NUMBER 02C01608 ARE PLACED INTO THE CASE FILE UNDER THIS NUMBER. JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED ON THE APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AS A FINAL DISPOSTION ON 06/15/12 , FOR (JENKINS PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CO.), INC. - ASSIGNOR (TRACO INVESTMENT CORP) A DELAWARE CORPORATION DBA (TRACORP) - ASSIGNEE , AGAINST (JONES, TANICA N.) SUED HEREIN AS (JONES, TANICA NICOLE) , PRINCIPAL (LINE E) $ 3370.00 , INTEREST AFTER JUDGMENT (LINE F) $ 3227.14 , FEE FOR FILING RENEWAL (LINE G) $ 30.00 . TOTAL $ 6,627.14 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 120.00 FILED BY (JENKINS PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CO.), INC. - ASSIGNOR (TRACO INVESTMENT CORP) A DELAWARE CORPORATION DBA (TRACORP) - ASSIGNEE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 3227.14 .

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 12CP1203    Hearing Date: December 12, 2019    Dept: 94

Defendant Tanica Jones’s Motion to Vacate Default and Default Judgment is DENIED.

ANALYSIS:

Discussion

The Court entered default judgment in favor of Plaintiff Jenkins Properties Management Co, Inc. (“Plaintiff” or “Judgment Creditor”) and against Defedant N. Desai aka Nerandra M. Desai (“Defendant” or “Judgment Debtor”) on July 8, 2002, and the judgment was renewed on June 15, 2012. Traco Investment Corp. (“Traco”) filed an Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment on October 17, 2017 stating that Traco was assigning the judgment to Bradford Brown (“Brown”). On November 21, 2019, Traco filed another Acknowledge of Assingment of Judgment stating that Brown reassigned the judgment agaisnt Judgment Debtor to Traco.

Judgment Debtor filed the instant Motion to Vacate Default and Default Judgment (the “Motion”) on September 4, 2019, but there is no proof of service attached to the moving papers. CCP § 1005(b) mandates that “all moving and supporting papers shall be served and filed at least 16 court days before the hearing. The moving and supporting papers served shall be a copy of the papers filed or to be filed with the court. However, if the notice is served by mail, the required 16-day period of notice before the hearing shall be increased by five calendar days if the place of mailing and the place of address are within the State of California. . .”

On November 12, 2019, this hearing was continued to the present date, December 12, 2019, because Judgment Debtor failed to demonstrate that the Motion was properly served on Judgment Creditor and Brown. This Court held that “Judgment Debtor is ordered to serve the Motion, including supplemental evidence if he wishes to file it, and file a proof of service of the same at least 16 court days before the continued hearing date.” (11/12/2019 Order). Since the November 12, 2019, Plaintiff has made no additional filings in this matter. Thus, Plainitff has failed to correct the defective service, or prove that proper service was made as required by the Court’s order.

On the merits, Judgment Debtor provides no evidence to show why the default and default judgment should be vacated.

II. Conclusion & Order

For the stated reasons, Defendant’s Motion to Vacate Default and Default Judgment is DENIED.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.