This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2019 at 01:01:24 (UTC).

JENKINS PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CO., INC. VS LUIS FERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 02/08/2018 JENKINS PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CO , INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LUIS FERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0579

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JENKINS PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CO. INC.

Defendant

FERNANDEZ LUIS

Pasadena, CA 91103

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FELMAN EDWARD LUIS

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/8/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

3/8/2018: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Application for Writ of Possession

3/8/2018: Application for Writ of Possession

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/8/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/8/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Writ of (name extension) - Possession

3/16/2018: Writ of (name extension) - Possession

Writ - Return

5/25/2018: Writ - Return

Writ of - Possession

3/16/2018: Writ of - Possession

Application for Writ of Possession

3/8/2018: Application for Writ of Possession

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

3/8/2018: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/8/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/8/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - on Complaint

2/8/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/8/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/8/2018: Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

2/9/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (LUIS FERNANDEZ)

2/9/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (LUIS FERNANDEZ)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/8/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2018
  • Case reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department R - Hon. William D. Dodsoneffective 12/24/2018; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Writ - Return ( Wholly Satisfied); Non-Party; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Writ of Possession; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/23/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: JENKINS PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CO., INC. (Plaintiff); As to: LUIS FERNANDEZ (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/18/2018; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: JENKINS PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CO., INC. (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; LUIS FERNANDEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Application for Writ of Possession; Filed by: JENKINS PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CO., INC. (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Default entered as to LUIS FERNANDEZ; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by JENKINS PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CO., INC. on 02/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff JENKINS PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CO., INC. against Defendant LUIS FERNANDEZ on the Complaint filed by JENKINS PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CO., INC. on 02/08/2018 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 240 CARLTON AVE., UNIT 3, Pasadena, CA 91103 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is not cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is not forfeited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: JENKINS PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CO., INC. (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Proof of Mailing Date: 02/18/2018; Service Cost: 15.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Notice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 02/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by: JENKINS PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CO., INC. (Plaintiff); As to: LUIS FERNANDEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JENKINS PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CO., INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G. Cortez in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/23/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JENKINS PROPERTIES MANAGEMETN COMPANY INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FELMAN EDWARD LUIS