This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 13:21:11 (UTC).

JEFFREY CUELLO VS LUIS ANGEL GARCIA

Case Summary

On 10/06/2017 JEFFREY CUELLO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LUIS ANGEL GARCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3304

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CUELLO JEFFREY

Defendants

GARCIA JESUS

GARCIA LUIS ANGEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BELORYAN HAIK ARMEN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/5/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/05/2019

4/5/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/05/2019

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

7/15/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

7/22/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/6/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/31/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/22/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 10/31/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Jeffrey Cuello (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 10/31/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/22/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/05/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 07/22/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/05/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jeffrey Cuello (Plaintiff); As to: Luis Angel Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jeffrey Cuello (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/05/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketOSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 17STLC03304    Hearing Date: October 31, 2019    Dept: 94

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

(CCP § 284(2); CRC Rule 3.1362)

TENTATIVE RULING

Attorney Haik Beloryan, Esq. of Law Offices of Haik Beloryan’s Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Jeffrey Cuello is GRANTED. The moving party has sufficiently complied with CCP § 284 and CRC 3.1362. Ruling to take effect upon filing of proof of service of the corrected and signed order on all parties.

Moving party to give notice to client and all parties.