This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 00:50:21 (UTC).

JEFFREY CUELLO VS BREANNA RAQUEL GARCIA

Case Summary

On 04/17/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by JEFFREY CUELLO against BREANNA RAQUEL GARCIA in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6202

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CUELLO JEFFREY

Defendant

GARCIA BREANNA RAQUEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/17/2018: Complaint

Summons - on Complaint

4/17/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/17/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/17/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 94 - Hon. James E. Blancarte; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jeffrey Cuello (Plaintiff); As to: Breanna Raquel Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jeffrey Cuello (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC06202    Hearing Date: March 11, 2020    Dept: 25

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

(CCP § 284(2); CRC rule 3.162)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff’s Counsel’s Haik Beloryan’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel is CONTINUED TO MAY 28, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Counsel must submit a supplemental declaration as requested herein. Failure to do so may result in the Motion being placed off calendar or denied.

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On April 17, 2018, Plaintiff Jeffrey Cuello (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for general negligence and motor vehicle negligence against Defendant Breanna Raquel Garcia (“Defendant”).

On October 11, 2019, Plaintiff’s counsel Haik Beloryan (“Counsel”) filed the instant Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (the “Motion”). No opposition has been filed.

A jury trial was scheduled for October 15, 2019. Pursuant to Counsel’s request, the Court continued the trial to June 16, 2020 to allow for the determination of the instant Motion. (10/15/19 Minute Order.)

  1. Legal Standard

The court may order that an attorney be changed or substituted at any time before or after judgment or final determination upon request by either client or attorney and after notice from one to the other. (Code Civ. Proc. § 284, subd. (2).) “The determination whether to grant or deny a motion to withdraw as counsel lies within the sound discretion of the trial court.” (Manfredi & Levine v. Superior Court (1998) 66 Cal.App.4th 1128, 1133.) An application to be relieved as counsel must be made on Judicial Counsel Forms MC-051 (Notice of Motion and Motion), MC-052 (Declaration), and MC-053 (Proposed Order). (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1362, subds. (a), (c), (e).)

In addition, California Rules of Court, rule 3.1362 subsection (d) requires that the notice of motion and motion, declaration, and proposed order be served on the client and all other parties who have appeared in the case by personal service, electronic service, or mail. If the notice is served by mail, it must be accompanied by a declaration stating facts showing that either:

(A) The service address is the current residence or business address of the client; or

(B) The service address is the last known residence or business address of the client and the attorney has been unable to locate a more current address after making reasonable efforts to do so within 30 days before the filing of the motion to be relieved.

(Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1362, subd. (1)(A) & (2).) (Italics added.)

  1. Discussion

Counsel seeks to be relieved as counsel due to a complete loss of communication with Plaintiff. (Form MC-052, ¶ 2, Exhs. B, D.) Counsel states his phone calls to Plaintiff have gone unanswered and that mail sent to Plaintiff’s last known address has been returned to his office as undeliverable and “unclaimed.” (Id. at ¶ 2.) Counsel has also attempted to confirm Plaintiff’s address via LexisNexis, which indicated that Plaintiff’s last known address is still his current address. (Id., Exh. C.)

In addition, Counsel states that he mailed “loss of contact” letters to Plaintiff on December 7, 2016, January 13, 2017, July 20, 2017, December 14, 2017, and May 16, 2019. (Id.)

The loss of contact letters and emails (dated December 27, 2016, July 21, 2017, and December 14, 2017) suggest that Counsel may have filed a small claims action on behalf of Plaintiff, for which Counsel also lost contact. (Id., Exhs. A, B.) However, it is unclear to the Court why Counsel, after having lost contact with Plaintiff for over a year, filed this limited action in April 2018. Thus, Counsel is ordered to provide a supplemental declaration providing an explanation for the above.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff’s Counsel’s Haik Beloryan’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel is CONTINUED TO MAY 28, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Counsel must submit a supplemental declaration as requested herein. Failure to do so may result in the Motion being placed off calendar or denied.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.