Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/31/2020 at 07:50:31 (UTC).

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC VS JENNIFER J SMITH

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JENNIFER J SMITH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANDREW C. KIM. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0879

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANDREW C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC

Defendant

SMITH JENNIFER J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOODMAN JOHN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/17/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

8/31/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/31/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

8/31/2020: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/31/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

8/31/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC on 08/31/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Andrew C. Kim in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Jennifer J Smith (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Jennifer J Smith (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Jennifer J Smith (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Jennifer J Smith (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less