This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 16:09:16 (UTC).

JAYDEN NELSON-OWENS, VS TODAY'S FRESH START CHARTER SCHOOL

Case Summary

On 11/15/2017 JAYDEN NELSON-OWENS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TODAY'S FRESH START CHARTER SCHOOL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4483

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court

SMITH NATASHA

Defendants

INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

TODAY'S FRESH START CHARTER SCHOOL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court Attorney

YEAGER KENNETH CHARLES

Defendant Attorney

BEACH THOMAS EDWIN

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Kenneth C. Yeager Re: OSC

6/13/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Kenneth C. Yeager Re: OSC

Complaint - (Amended)

11/15/2017: Complaint - (Amended)

Request for Dismissal

2/14/2018: Request for Dismissal

Summons - (Amended)

4/5/2018: Summons - (Amended)

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

5/14/2018: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Proof of Personal Service

5/22/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/22/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

6/1/2018: Answer

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

5/9/2019: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

5/9/2019: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

5/9/2019: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

12/13/2017: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/15/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/15/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Kenneth C. Yeager Re: OSC; Filed by: Jayden Nelson-Owens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 06/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Jayden Nelson-Owens (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: Yes; Settlement Type: Unconditional; OSC re: Dismissal Date: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 06/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 06/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Today's Fresh Start Charter School (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Jayden Nelson-Owens (Plaintiff): Last Name changed from Nelson-Owens, to Nelson-Owens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jayden Nelson-Owens, (Plaintiff); As to: Today's Fresh Start Charter School (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Complaint (1st): Status Date changed from 03/09/2018 to 11/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jayden Nelson-Owens, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Result: Withdrawn - Filed in Error; Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 17STLC04483    Hearing Date: March 09, 2020    Dept: 26

Nelson-Owens v. Today’s Fresh Start Charter School, et al.

EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISES

OF PENDING ACTION ON BEHALF OF MINOR

(CRC 7.950.5(c)(1))

TENTATIVE RULING:

Expedited Petition of Natasha Smith to Approve Compromise of Pending Action on Behalf of Minor Plaintiff Jayden Neson-Owens is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL IS CONTINUED TO 06/08/20 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. FAILURE TO APPEAR MAY RESULT IN THE ACTION BEING DISMISSED.

ANALYSIS:

On November 15, 2017, Plaintiff minor Plaintiff Jayden Neson-Owens (“Claimant”), by and through his Guardian Ad Litem Natasha Smith (“Petitioner”), filed the instant action for statutory negligence against Defendants Today’s Fresh Start Charter School (“Defendant”) and Inglewood Unified School District (“IUSD”). Petitioner was appointed Claimant’s guardian ad litem on December 13, 2017. IUSD was dismissed from the action on February 14, 2018. A First Amended Complaint was filed on March 9, 2018. Defendant filed its Answer on June 1, 2018.

On May 9, 2019, the parties filed a Notice of Settlement. Petitioner filed the instant Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action (the “Petition”) on behalf of Claimant on October 16, 2019. On December 17, 2019, the Court issued an order regarding the Expedited Petition, finding it incomplete in several respects. (Minute Order, 12/17/19.) As a result, the Court set the Expedited Petition for hearing on March 9, 2020. (Ibid.) Notice of the order was served on both parties on the same date. (Certificate of Mailing, 12/17/19.)

On February 19, 2020, Plaintiff’s counsel filed a declaration with respect to the February 24, 2020 Order to Show Cause stating that “The Petition has been filed. Per the Court's Order modifications need to be made to it. A Hearing is Scheduled for March 09, 2020.” (Yeager Decl., filed 2/19/20.)

Contrary to the declaration of Plaintiff’s attorney, no amended Petition has been filed correcting the defects noted in the Court’s December 17, 2019 order. Accordingly, the hearing on the Expedited Petition of Natasha Smith to Approve Compromise of Pending Action on Behalf of Minor Plaintiff Jayden Neson-Owens is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL IS CONTINUED TO 06/08/20 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. FAILURE TO APPEAR MAY RESULT IN THE ACTION BEING DISMISSED.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.