This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/29/2019 at 14:23:01 (UTC).

JAVIER GARCIA VS RON READY

Case Summary

On 08/20/2018 JAVIER GARCIA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RON READY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3987

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA JAVIER

Santa Fe Springs, CA 90670

Defendant

READY RON

Costa Mesa, CA 92627

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing - Other on Status of Bankruptcy) of 08/30/2019

8/30/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing - Other on Status of Bankruptcy) of 08/30/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing - Other on Status of Bankruptcy)

8/30/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing - Other on Status of Bankruptcy)

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service WARRANT RECALLED

7/12/2019: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service WARRANT RECALLED

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 05/10/2019

5/10/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 05/10/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

5/10/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Bench Warrant Hearing)

5/10/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Bench Warrant Hearing)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Bench Warrant Hearing) of 05/10/2019

5/10/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Bench Warrant Hearing) of 05/10/2019

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 05/02/2019

5/2/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 05/02/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

5/2/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

4/8/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 04/08/2019

4/8/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 04/08/2019

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

4/2/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination - Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

2/4/2019: Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination - Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

10/23/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/23/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

10/23/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/23/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/23/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

9/7/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/20/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by JAVIER GARCIA on 08/20/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing - Other on Status of Bankruptcy)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing - Other on Status of Bankruptcy) of 08/30/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketHearing - Other on Status of Bankruptcy scheduled for 08/30/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 08/30/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service - No Service WARRANT RECALLED: As To Parties changed from RON READY (Defendant) to RON READY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service WARRANT RECALLED; Filed by: JAVIER GARCIA (Plaintiff); As to: RON READY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketBench Warrant Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketHearing - Other on Status of Bankruptcy scheduled for 08/30/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketBench Warrant - ORAP status updated to Recalled and Quashed on 05/10/2019; As to: RON READY ( Defendant )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Bench Warrant Hearing)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/23/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 10/23/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff JAVIER GARCIA against Defendant RON READY on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by JAVIER GARCIA on 08/20/2018 for the principal amount of $9,999.00 and costs of $150.00 for a total of $10,149.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/23/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: JAVIER GARCIA (Plaintiff); As to: RON READY (Defendant); Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 08/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: JAVIER GARCIA (Plaintiff); As to: RON READY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/20/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketDue to Clerical Error, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/20/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Not Held - Clerical Error was rescheduled to 10/23/2018 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less