This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2018 at 04:42:32 (UTC).

JAVADI, JILLA VS SAMOOKHIAN, BAHRAM

Case Summary

On 05/08/2014 JAVADI, JILLA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SAMOOKHIAN, BAHRAM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NANCY NEWMAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4476

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

NANCY NEWMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAVADI JILLA

Defendant

SAMOOKHIAN BAHRAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMONIAN VICKEN I ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2014
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. WES , HON. NANCY NEWMAN PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: MATTER PLACED OFF CALENDAR. NO APPEARANCES.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. WES , HON. NANCY NEWMAN PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: MATTER PLACED OFF CALENDAR. NO APPEARANCES.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION FILED. SERVED AS TO (SAMOOKHIAN, BAHRAM) . COSTS OF $ 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • DocketORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. MATTER SET ON 11/26/14 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. WES .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR (SAMOOKHIAN, BAHRAM) RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DEPT. WEQ FOR CONSIDERATION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 09/11/14 , FOR (JAVADI, JILLA) , AGAINST (SAMOOKHIAN, BAHRAM) , PAST DUE RENT $ 11083.00 , DAILY DAMAGES $ 10732.00 , ATTORNEY FEES $ 1605.00 , COSTS $ 0.00 . TOTAL $ 23,420.00 . RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF PREMISES NOT AT ISSUE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED. REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (SAMOOKHIAN, BAHRAM) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION, NOTICE OF OSC UD CASES, GENERAL ORDER FILED. SERVED AS TO (SAMOOKHIAN, BAHRAM) . COSTS OF $ 50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • DocketREJECT SHEET SENT TO (JAVADI, JILLA) FOR REJECTION OF FAULTY PROOF OF SERVICE: PROOF OF SERVICE ARE NOT SIGNED. PLEASE REVISE AND RESUBMIT SUBMITTED ON 05/19/14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM519607034. Filing Fee: 240.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 06/17/14 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. WES .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. WES , HONORABLE NANCY NEWMAN .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less