This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2018 at 10:20:15 (UTC).

JASMINE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC VS GS BATES ENTERPRISES, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA JERSEY MIKE'S SUBS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/31/2018 JASMINE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against GS BATES ENTERPRISES, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA JERSEY MIKE'S SUBS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN J. TOWNSEND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0288

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    West Covina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN J. TOWNSEND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JASMINE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendants

GS BATES ENTERPRISES A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA JERSEY MIKE'S SUBS DBA JERSEY MIKE'S SUBS

1281 N. Hacienda Boulevard

La Puente, CA 91744

BATES GARY S.

La Puente, CA 91744

BATES RENE Y

La Puente, CA 91744

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLER STACEY ANN

Defendant Attorney

LEE SEONG YON

 

Court Documents

Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

6/8/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

Notice of Ruling - on Demurrer of Defendant to Complaint and Proof of Service

5/15/2018: Notice of Ruling - on Demurrer of Defendant to Complaint and Proof of Service

Minute Order - (Hearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike To Complaint)

5/14/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike To Complaint)

Objection - Defendant' Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Stacey A. Miller in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer and Proof of Service.

5/7/2018: Objection - Defendant' Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Stacey A. Miller in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer and Proof of Service.

Reply - Defendant' Reply Brief in Support of Demurrer to the Complaint or, in the Alternative , Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Proof of Service

5/7/2018: Reply - Defendant' Reply Brief in Support of Demurrer to the Complaint or, in the Alternative , Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Proof of Service

Opposition - to Defendants' Demurrer and Proof of Service

5/1/2018: Opposition - to Defendants' Demurrer and Proof of Service

Objection - Defendant's Objections to the Notice of Ruling filed by Plaintiff and Proof of Service

4/19/2018: Objection - Defendant's Objections to the Notice of Ruling filed by Plaintiff and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

4/6/2018: Request for Dismissal

Opposition - to Defendant's Demurrer and Proof of Service

3/21/2018: Opposition - to Defendant's Demurrer and Proof of Service

Request for Judicial Notice - and Proof of Service

3/21/2018: Request for Judicial Notice - and Proof of Service

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - To The Complaint, Or, In The Alternative, Motion to Strike Portions of the Complaint; Declaration Of Sonia Y. Lee In Support Thereof

3/9/2018: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - To The Complaint, Or, In The Alternative, Motion to Strike Portions of the Complaint; Declaration Of Sonia Y. Lee In Support Thereof

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Faulty does not state if that person is a Authorized Agent of service.

2/13/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Faulty does not state if that person is a Authorized Agent of service.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/31/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (GS Bates Enterprises, A California Corporation DBA Jersey Mike's Subs)

2/1/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (GS Bates Enterprises, A California Corporation DBA Jersey Mike's Subs)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Gary S. Bates)

2/1/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Gary S. Bates)

Complaint

1/31/2018: Complaint

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

1/31/2018: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/31/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2018
  • Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/25/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial; Filed by: Jasmine Real Estate Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Answer; Filed by: GS Bates Enterprises, A California Corporation DBA Jersey Mike's Subs (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Notice of Ruling on Demurrer of Defendant to Complaint and Proof of Service; Filed by: Jasmine Real Estate Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike To Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Updated -- Demurrer - without Motion to Strike To Complaint: Result: Overruled; Result Date: 05/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Hearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike To Complaint scheduled for 05/14/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6 updated: Result Date to 05/14/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Objection Defendant' Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Stacey A. Miller in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer and Proof of Service. Filed by: GS Bates Enterprises, A California Corporation DBA Jersey Mike's Subs (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Reply Defendant' Reply Brief in Support of Demurrer to the Complaint or, in the Alternative , Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Proof of Service; Filed by: GS Bates Enterprises, A California Corporation DBA Jersey Mike's Subs (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2018
  • Hearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike To the Complaint, Or, In The Alternative, Motion to Strike Portions of The Complaint scheduled for 04/04/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service Faulty does not state if that person is a Authorized Agent of service. Filed by: Jasmine Real Estate Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: GS Bates Enterprises, A California Corporation DBA Jersey Mike's Subs (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/08/2018; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Notice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 02/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by: Jasmine Real Estate Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: GS Bates Enterprises, A California Corporation DBA Jersey Mike's Subs (Defendant); Gary S. Bates (Defendant); Rene Y Bates (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jasmine Real Estate Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Susan J. Townsend in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/11/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

FILED

v 4 ANGRIES SUPERIOR COURT

THARPE & HOWELL, LLP MAY 15 2018 15250 Ventura Boulevard, Ninth Floor ‘ Sherman Oaks, California 91403 SHERRIR. leé%e OFFICER/ CLERK (818) 205-9955; (818) 205-9944 fax BY JESSE AR DEPUTY

| STACEY A. MILLER, ESQ.; STATE BAR NO.: 161628 Attorneys for Plaintiffs JASMINE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, EAST JUDICIAL DISTRICT

JASMINE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, | Case No.: 18WCUD00288

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER OF

GS BATES ENTERPRISES, a California DEFENDANTS TO COMPLAINT Corporation, dba JERSEY MIKE’S SUBS; GARY S. BATES, an individual; RENE Y. Date: May 14, 2018 BATES, an individual; and DOES 1 to 10, Time: 8:30 a.m. inclusive, Dept: 6

Defendants.

TO ALL PARTIES AND THEIR ATTORNEYS OF RECORD HEREIN: 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that the Demurrer of Defendant GS BATES ENTERPRISES dba o4 JERSEY MIKE’S SUBS s to the Complaint came on for regular hearing on May 14, 2018 at 8:30 3 a.m. in Department 6 of the above entitled court. Sonia Y. Lee of SKS LAW GROUP appeared on ‘ behalf of Defendant and Stacey A. Miller of Tharpe & Howell, LLP appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. After consideration of the moving and opposing papers, and oral argument, the Court ruled as follows: l. The Demurrer is Overruled;

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GS BATES ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER STACEY ANN