This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2017 at 14:17:17 (UTC).

JASMINE BROWN VS BEACH FRONT PROPERTY MGNT INC

Case Summary

On 11/03/2016 JASMINE BROWN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BEACH FRONT PROPERTY MGNT INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4565

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWN JASMINE

Defendant

BEACH FRONT PROPERTY MGNT INC

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

4/14/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order of 04/14/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

4/14/2017: Minute Order of 04/14/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

4/14/2017: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

4/14/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

4/14/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

11/3/2016: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

11/14/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

Notice of Rejection

6/29/2017: Notice of Rejection

[Notice of Rejection]

6/29/2017: [Notice of Rejection]

Rejection Sheet - - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

6/29/2017: Rejection Sheet - - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

12/1/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

12/15/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order of 12/15/2016

12/15/2016: Minute Order of 12/15/2016

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/15/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

2/17/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order of 02/17/2017

2/17/2017: Minute Order of 02/17/2017

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/17/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2017
  • Invoice: Sheriff?s Recovery Fee; Fee: $40.00; Balance: $40.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Balance: $75.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • Payment: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Amount: $75.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0014787 (Check)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • Payment: Sheriff?s Recovery Fee; Amount: $40.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0014787 (Check)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Rejection Sheet - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Notice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 04/14/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2016
  • Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Jasmine Brown (Plaintiff); As to: Beach Front Property Mgnt Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Invoice: Sm Clms Amended <=$5k to >$5k,-10k-CCP116.230(d)(2);CCP116.221; Fee: $25.00; Balance: $25.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Payment: Sm Clms Amended <=$5k to >$5k,-10k-CCP116.230(d)(2);CCP116.221; Amount: $25.00 Receipt: IW-2016-0006344 (Waived Court)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Jasmine Brown (Plaintiff); As to: Beach Front Property Mgnt Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Jasmine Brown (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Jasmine Brown (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: IW-2016-0006013 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/15/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Updated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Result Date changed from 11/03/2016 to 11/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEACH FRONT PROPERTIES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant