Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/31/2019 at 01:21:55 (UTC).

JANISS HERNANDEZ, ET AL. VS OSEGUERA INVESTMENTS INC.

Case Summary

On 05/24/2018 JANISS HERNANDEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against OSEGUERA INVESTMENTS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2502

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DELGADO ELMER

HERNANDEZ ANDY

HERNANDEZ JANISS

Defendant

OSEGUERA INVESTMENTS INC.

 

Court Documents

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

7/30/2018: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

7/30/2018: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

9/6/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Small Claims Settlement Agreement - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

12/10/2018: Small Claims Settlement Agreement - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/10/2018

12/10/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/10/2018

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/10/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/10/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

5/24/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2018
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Janiss Hernandez, et al. on 05/24/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/10/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/10/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 12/10/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Oseguera Investments Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Janiss Hernandez (Plaintiff); Elmer Delgado (Plaintiff); Andy Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Oseguera Investments Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 450.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 09/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Janiss Hernandez (Plaintiff); Elmer Delgado (Plaintiff); Andy Hernandez (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/31/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 12/10/2018 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Janiss Hernandez (Plaintiff); Elmer Delgado (Plaintiff); Andy Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Oseguera Investments Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/31/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Oseguera Investment Inc. is a litigant