Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/06/2019 at 01:24:28 (UTC).

JANE GLASSMAN VS CHAD STANSBURY

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by JANE GLASSMAN against CHAD STANSBURY in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2827

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

MATTHEW ST. GEORGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GLASSMAN JANE

Defendant

STANSBURY CHAD

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/30/2018

10/30/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/30/2018

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/23/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/10/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/30/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Jane Glassman on 09/10/2018, entered Order for Dismissal with prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/30/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department E updated: Result Date to 10/30/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jane Glassman (Plaintiff); As to: Chad Stansbury (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/10/2018; Service Cost: 125.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: As To Parties changed from Chad Stansbury (Defendant) to Chad Stansbury (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Jane Glassman (Plaintiff); As to: Chad Stansbury (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Matthew St. George in Department E Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department E

    Read MoreRead Less