This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/04/2021 at 00:16:10 (UTC).

JAMIESON, PAUL VS PUBLIC STORAGE GOLETA,INC.

Case Summary

On 05/15/2012 JAMIESON, PAUL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PUBLIC STORAGE GOLETA,INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DARREN LEWIS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2832

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DARREN LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JAMIESON PAULDBAPAUL JAMIESON STUDIO RENTALS

JAMIESON PAUL DBA PAUL JAMIESON STUDIO RENTALS

Defendants

PUBLIC STORAGE GOLETA INC.DBA PUBLIC STORAGE

PUBLIC STORAGE GOLETA INC. DBA PUBLIC STORAGE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 09/06/12 AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (PUBLIC STORAGE GOLETA,INC.)DBA (PUBLIC STORAGE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NWZ , HON. DARREN LEWIS, PRO-TEM PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 09/06/12 . FOR (JAMIESON, PAUL)DBA(PAUL JAMIESON STUDIO RENTALS) . AGAINST (PUBLIC STORAGE GOLETA,INC.)DBA (PUBLIC STORAGE) . PRINCIPAL $ 10000.00 . COSTS $ 110.00 . TOTAL $ 10110.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS. CONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • DocketNOTICE/LETTER RE: SC-100, PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER RETURNED AS TO (JAMIESON, PAUL)DBA(PAUL JAMIESON STUDIO RENTALS) DUE TO NO SUCH NUMBER - UNABLE TO FORWARD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT (BEFORE SERVICE) FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • DocketMATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 09/06/12 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NWZ .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • DocketCLERK`S NOTICE SC-100 NEW HEARING DATE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAV441726040. HEARING SET FOR 07/12/12 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. NWZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PUBLIC STORAGE GOLETA INC. is a litigant