Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 17:38:13 (UTC).

JAMES RODRIGUEZ VS KIM SING THEATRE, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 JAMES RODRIGUEZ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against KIM SING THEATRE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4649

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ JAMES

Defendant

KIM SING THEATRE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEHRBAN MORSE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/16/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

6/3/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/3/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

6/3/2020: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/3/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by James Rodriguez on 06/03/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by James Rodriguez as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketAddress for Morse Mehrban (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: James Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: James Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: James Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Kim Sing Theatre, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: James Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Kim Sing Theatre, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: James Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Kim Sing Theatre, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less