This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/10/2021 at 19:15:30 (UTC).

JAMES RODRIGUEZ VS DUQUESNE PROPERTIES, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/14/2018 JAMES RODRIGUEZ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against DUQUESNE PROPERTIES, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4070

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ JAMES

Defendant

DUQUESNE PROPERTIES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEHRBAN MORSE

Defendant Attorney

MERTENS GLEN HENRY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/30/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/19/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Award of Attorney Fees

1/9/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Award of Attorney Fees

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

1/13/2020: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)

3/4/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)

Judgment - Judgment Proposed Judgment

8/13/2019: Judgment - Judgment Proposed Judgment

Offer to Compromise and Acceptance Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 998 - Offer to Compromise and Acceptance Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 998

8/13/2019: Offer to Compromise and Acceptance Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 998 - Offer to Compromise and Acceptance Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 998

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

8/22/2019: Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Motion for Attorney Fees - Motion for Attorney Fees

8/22/2019: Motion for Attorney Fees - Motion for Attorney Fees

Answer

5/18/2018: Answer

Summons - on Complaint

3/14/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/14/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

5/30/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

5/24/2018: Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/14/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Attorney Fees scheduled for 03/04/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 03/04/2020; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Re: Payment of Waived Fees; Filed by: James Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: James Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Duquesne Properties, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal of Motion for Award of Attorney Fees; Filed by: James Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Duquesne Properties, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees scheduled for 01/06/2020 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 03/04/2020 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Morse Mehrban (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketAddress for Morse Mehrban (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketMotion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: James Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Duquesne Properties, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: James Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: James Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: James Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: James Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Duquesne Properties, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC04070    Hearing Date: March 04, 2020    Dept: 25

MOTION FOR ATTORNEY’S FEES

(CCP § 51)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff James Rodriguez’s Motion for Attorney’s Fees is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On March 14, 2018, Plaintiff James Rodriguez (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for violation of the Unruh Civil Rights Act against Defendant Duquesne Properties, LLC (“Defendant”). On May 18, 2018, Defendant filed an Answer.

On August 13, 2019, the Court entered a Judgment in favor of Plaintiff pursuant to the parties’ stipulation in the amount of $4,001.00. (8/13/19 Judgment.)

On August 22, 2019, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion for Award of Attorney Fees (the “Motion”). On January 9, 2020, Plaintiff filed a Notice of Withdrawal of his Motion for Attorney’s Fees. Accordingly, the Motion is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff James Rodriguez’s Motion for Attorney’s Fees is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DUQUESNE PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MERTENS GLEN H. ESQ.