Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2020 at 04:24:37 (UTC).

JAMES FRAUTNICK VS A1 SOLAR POWER INC.

Case Summary

On 08/31/2017 JAMES FRAUTNICK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against A1 SOLAR POWER INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0188

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRAUTNICK JAMES

Canyon Country, CA 91387

Defendant

A1 SOLAR POWER INC.

15025 Oxnard St. Suite 200

Van Nuys, CA 91411

 

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL - Notice of Entry of Judgment, 10/13/17 Minute Order

10/23/2017: RETURNED MAIL - Notice of Entry of Judgment, 10/13/17 Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/13/2017

10/13/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/13/2017

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

10/13/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

10/13/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/18/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/31/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

9/1/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL Notice of Entry of Judgment, 10/13/17 Minute Order; Filed by: As to: A1 Solar Power Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff James Frautnick against Defendant A1 Solar Power Inc. on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by James Frautnick on 08/31/2017 for the principal amount of $10,000.00 and costs of $50.00 for a total of $10,050.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/13/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/13/2017 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 updated: Result Date to 10/13/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: James Frautnick (Plaintiff); As to: A1 Solar Power Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/08/2017; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/13/2017 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: James Frautnick (Plaintiff); As to: A1 Solar Power Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to in Department F44 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A1 SOLAR POWER INC AKA DAVID MACK is a litigant