This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2017 at 22:11:03 (UTC).

JAMES, DIA VS SUMMIT AT WARNER CENTER

Case Summary

On 04/20/2016 JAMES, DIA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SUMMIT AT WARNER CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3777

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMES DIA

Defendant

SUMMIT AT WARNER CENTER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2016
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/23/2016 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z updated: Result Date to 08/23/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/23/2016 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to 08/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/23/2016 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/23/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN FEE WAIVER. HEARING SET FOR 06/23/16 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. NWZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (JAMES, DIA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (JAMES, DIA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUMMIT AT WARNER CENTER is a litigant