This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/07/2020 at 10:42:03 (UTC).

JAIRO GOMEZ, M.D. VS GARDENA HOSPITAL, LP

Case Summary

On 08/12/2019 JAIRO GOMEZ, M D filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GARDENA HOSPITAL, LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7431

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOMEZ M.D. JAIRO

Defendant

GARDENA HOSPITAL LP

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/30/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Plaintiff's Failure to File Opposiiton to Defendant Gardena Hospital's Motion to Compel Arbitration

1/14/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Plaintiff's Failure to File Opposiiton to Defendant Gardena Hospital's Motion to Compel Arbitration

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)

1/21/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Ruling and Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Status of Arbitration or Dismissal

1/21/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Ruling and Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Status of Arbitration or Dismissal

Motion to Compel Arbitration - Motion to Compel Arbitration

9/18/2019: Motion to Compel Arbitration - Motion to Compel Arbitration

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

8/23/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/12/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

8/12/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/12/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

8/12/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/12/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Status of Arbitration/Dismissal scheduled for 06/22/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/15/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Binding Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Jairo Gomez, M.D. (Plaintiff); As to: GARDENA HOSPITAL, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Jairo Gomez, M.D. on 08/12/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Jairo Gomez, M.D. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Binding Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Status of Arbitration/Dismissal scheduled for 06/22/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling and Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Status of Arbitration or Dismissal; Filed by: GARDENA HOSPITAL, LP (Defendant); As to: Jairo Gomez, M.D. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: GARDENA HOSPITAL, LP (Defendant); As to: Jairo Gomez, M.D. (Plaintiff); GARDENA HOSPITAL, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Jairo Gomez, M.D. (Plaintiff); As to: GARDENA HOSPITAL, LP (Defendant); Service Date: 08/19/2019; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jairo Gomez, M.D. (Plaintiff); As to: GARDENA HOSPITAL, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jairo Gomez, M.D. (Plaintiff); As to: GARDENA HOSPITAL, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jairo Gomez, M.D. (Plaintiff); As to: GARDENA HOSPITAL, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC07431    Hearing Date: January 21, 2020    Dept: 94

Tentatives for Department 94 will now be posted under Department 25 or Department 26 of the Spring Street Courthouse.