This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/05/2020 at 06:40:49 (UTC).

JAHEIM REED VS RICHARD MARK RAMSEY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/13/2019 JAHEIM REED filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RICHARD MARK RAMSEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8448

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

REED MINOR JAHEIM

RZEED DENIECE

Defendants

KELLY ROBERT JAMES

RAMSEY RICHARD MARK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WERNIK BRUCE ALAN

 

Court Documents

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgm

8/3/2020: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgm

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account - Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

8/3/2020: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account - Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing - Other Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Act...) of 08/03/2020

8/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing - Other Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Act...) of 08/03/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing - Other Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Act...)

8/3/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing - Other Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Act...)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/21/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/16/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Hearing Date and Amended Medical Report for Minor's Compromise Hearing

1/7/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Hearing Date and Amended Medical Report for Minor's Compromise Hearing

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 12/27/2019

12/27/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 12/27/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/27/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

11/19/2019: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

10/8/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/13/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

9/13/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/13/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

9/13/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/13/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2022
  • Hearing09/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Hearing03/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • Hearing11/19/2020 at 09:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (Miscellaneous): Filed By: Deniece Rzeed (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 11/19/2020 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by: Jaheim Reed minor (Plaintiff); Deniece Rzeed (Plaintiff); As to: Richard Mark Ramsey (Defendant); Robert James Kelly (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account: Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by: Jaheim Reed minor (Plaintiff); Deniece Rzeed (Plaintiff); As to: Richard Mark Ramsey (Defendant); Robert James Kelly (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous): Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing - Other Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Act...)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Status Date changed from 10/08/2019 to 10/08/2019; Result Date changed from 10/07/2019 to 10/08/2019; As To Parties changed from Robert James Kelly (Defendant), Richard Mark Ramsey (Defendant) to Richard Mark Ramsey (Defendant), Robert James Kelly (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Filed By: Jaheim Reed minor (Plaintiff),Deniece Rzeed (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jaheim Reed minor (Plaintiff); Deniece Rzeed (Plaintiff); As to: Richard Mark Ramsey (Defendant); Robert James Kelly (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jaheim Reed minor (Plaintiff); Deniece Rzeed (Plaintiff); As to: Richard Mark Ramsey (Defendant); Robert James Kelly (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jaheim Reed minor (Plaintiff); Deniece Rzeed (Plaintiff); As to: Richard Mark Ramsey (Defendant); Robert James Kelly (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC08448    Hearing Date: August 03, 2020    Dept: 26

EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISES

OF PENDING ACTION ON BEHALF OF MINOR

(CRC 7.950.5(c)(1))

TENTATIVE RULING:

Expedited Petition of Deniece Reed to Approve Compromise of Pending Action on Behalf of Minor Plaintiff Jaheim Reed is GRANTED.

ANALYSIS:

On September 13, 2019, minor Plaintiff Jaheim Reed (“Claimant”), by and through his Guardian Ad Litem Deniece Reed (“Petitioner”) filed the instant action for motor vehicle negligence against Defendants Richard Mark Ramsey and Robert James Kelly (collectively, “Defendants”). Petitioner was appointed as Claimant’s guardian ad litem on October 8, 2019. Petitioner filed the instant Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action (the “Expedited Petition”) on behalf of Claimant on November 19, 2019.

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim. (Prob. Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; Code Civ. Proc., § 372.) “‘[W]ithout trial court approval of the proposed compromise of the ward’s claim, the settlement cannot be valid. [Citation.] [¶] Nor is the settlement binding [on the minor] until it is endorsed by the trial court.’” (Pearson v. Superior Court (2012) 202 Cal.App.4th 1333, 1338.) To obtain court approval of the settlement of a minor’s claims, the guardian ad litem must file a complete and “verified petition for approval of the settlement and must disclose ‘all information that has any bearing upon the reasonableness of the compromise.’ [Citations.]” (Barnes v. Western Heritage Ins. Co. (2013) 217 Cal.App.4th 249, 256; CRC 7.950.)

On December 27, 2019, the Court reviewed the Expedited Petition and found it to be incomplete. Specifically, (1) the Petition was filed on the wrong Judicial Council Form; (2) proposed orders were not filed; and (3) Petitioner attached doctors’ reports that pre-dated the alleged date of Claimant’s injuries. (Minute Order, 12/27/19.) The Court set the Expedited Petition for hearing on March 18, 2020. On January 7, 2020, Petitioner filed supplemental papers addressing the Court’s concerns.

On March 18, 2020, hearings at the Court were continued due to the COVID-19 pandemic. The hearing on the Expedited Petition was ultimately continued to August 3, 2020.

Having reviewed the supplemental papers filed by Petitioner on January 7, 2020, the Court now finds that the Expedited Petition is complete and provides for a reasonable settlement to minor Plaintiff based on his injuries and prognosis. Proposed orders were filed concurrently. Therefore, the Expedited Petition of Deniece Reed to Approve Compromise of Pending Action on Behalf of Minor Plaintiff Jaheim Reed is GRANTED.

Moving party to give notice.