This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/19/2016 at 07:03:15 (UTC).

JAGMAAR PROPERTIES, LLC. VS. NASA INVESTMENTS, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/13/2014 JAGMAAR PROPERTIES, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NASA INVESTMENTS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM V. MCTAGGERT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0424

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM V. MCTAGGERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAGMAAR PROPERTIES LLC.

Defendants

NASA INVESTMENTS LLC

CAMDEN REALTY GROUP C/O RANA TALWINDER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2015
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 06/09/15 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 02:18P M, IN DEPT. SW8 , HON. WILLIAM V. MCTAGGERT PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (CAMDEN REALTY GROUP) C/O RANA, TALWINDER BY SUB-SERVING DAVID CONDON, SR. VICE PRESIDENT . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/21/14 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. SW8 COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • AMENDMENT TO CLAIM OF (JAGMAAR PROPERTIES, LLC.) FILED CHANGE ADDRESS FOR /D01 ,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN ING439303008. HEARING SET FOR 03/21/14 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. SW8.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less