This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2021 at 03:24:02 (UTC).

JACQUELYN ATENCIO VS HR WEST HILLS MOB SPE, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/16/2019 JACQUELYN ATENCIO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HR WEST HILLS MOB SPE, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4868

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ATENCIO JACQUELYN

Defendants

HR WEST HILLS MOB SPE LLC DBA HEALTHCARE REALTY TRUST INCORPORATED

BRIGHTVIEW HOLDINGS INC. DBA BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPING

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

3/23/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 03/23/2020

3/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 03/23/2020

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

3/23/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By: Olga Krumm

1/6/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By: Olga Krumm

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By: Scott Godfrey

1/6/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By: Scott Godfrey

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/6/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) (Untimely)

12/11/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) (Untimely)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

12/10/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

12/10/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/11/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/11/2019

12/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/11/2019

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By: Felix Mendez

12/11/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By: Felix Mendez

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By: Joseph Schlottman

12/11/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By: Joseph Schlottman

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

11/8/2019: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/13/2019

11/13/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/13/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/13/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) No POS by Mail

11/1/2019: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) No POS by Mail

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

9/24/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Jacquelyn Atencio on 09/16/2019 as follows: Defendants HR West Hills MOB SPE, LLC DBA Healthcare Realty Trust Incorporated; Brightview Holdings, Inc. DBA BrightView Landscaping do not owe the plaintiff Jacquelyn Atencio any money on plaintiff's claim. Other: The Court finds that plaintiff Jacquelyn Atencio did not meet her burden of proof to show that defendants were negligent in connection with plaintiff's injury on or about 9/17/17. Specifically, the Court finds that plaintiff failed to use ordinary care while crossing the grassway where the drain covers were located.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 03/23/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By: Scott Godfrey; Filed by: Brightview Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By: Olga Krumm; Filed by: HR West Hills MOB SPE, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department H updated: Result Date to 01/06/2020; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By: Felix Mendez; Filed by: HR West Hills MOB SPE, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By: Joseph Schlottman; Filed by: Brightview Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- 11/13/2019 Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department P to Department H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6): Filed By: Jacquelyn Atencio (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 09/24/2019; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: Jacquelyn Atencio (Plaintiff); Judge Name: Richard F. Walmark

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/13/2019 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Jacquelyn Atencio (Plaintiff); As to: HR West Hills MOB SPE, LLC (Defendant); Brightview Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less