This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2021 at 01:09:04 (UTC).

JACOB SEARING VS BARBARA SIMONS

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 JACOB SEARING filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against BARBARA SIMONS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4103

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SEARING JACOB

Respondent

SIMONS BARBARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COOK GEOFFREY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

5/4/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 04/14/2021

4/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 04/14/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

4/14/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

12/14/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Supplemental Declaration (name extension) - Supplemental Declaration Proposed Judgment

12/14/2020: Supplemental Declaration (name extension) - Supplemental Declaration Proposed Judgment

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

12/14/2020: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/14/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

12/14/2020: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 04/14/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 04/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 05/04/2021 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 05/04/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 04/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by: Jacob Searing (Petitioner); As to: Barbara Simons (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration Proposed Judgment; Filed by: Jacob Searing (Petitioner); As to: Barbara Simons (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCP04103    Hearing Date: May 4, 2021    Dept: 25

PROCEEDINGS: PETITION TO CONFIRM AND CORRECT ARBITRATION AWARD

MOVING PARTY: Petitioner Jacob Searing

RESP. PARTY: None

PETITION TO CONFIRM AND CORRECT ARBITRATION AWARD

(CCP § 1285)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Petitioner Jacob Searing’s Petition to Confirm and Correct Contractual Arbitration Award is CONTINUED TO June 8, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Petitioner must file supplemental papers addressing the deficiencies noted herein. Failure to do so may result in the Petition being taken off calendar or denied.

SERVICE:

[ ] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) NO

[ ] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) NO

[ ] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) NO

OPPOSITION: None filed as of April 30, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of April 30, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

I. Background & Discussion

Petitioner Jacob Searing (“Petitioner”) filed the instant Petition to Confirm and Correct Contractual Arbitration Award (the “Petition”) against Respondent Barbara Simons (“Respondent”).

First, Petitioner failed to file a proof of service demonstrating the Petition and Notice of Hearing were served on Respondent as required by Code of Civil Procedure section 1290.4. In addition, Petitioner’s counsel submitted a declaration stating Exhibits A, B, and C were attached, but no such exhibits were filed.

Petitioner is ordered to correct these errors.

II. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Petitioner Jacob Searing’s Petition to Confirm and Correct Contractual Arbitration Award is CONTINUED TO June 8, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Petitioner must file supplemental papers addressing the deficiencies noted herein. Failure to do so may result in the Petition being taken off calendar or denied.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.