This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/21/2019 at 03:40:00 (UTC).

JACK, GREGORY VS COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/13/2017 JACK, GREGORY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3197

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JACK GREGORY

JACK JAHMILAH

VANWAARDENBURG ASIM

Defendants

THE HAIN CELESTIAL GROUP

DOES 1-50 INCLUSIVE

NSPIRED NATURAL FOODS INC.

COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCMURRAY HENRIKS, LLP

MCMURRAY HENRIKS LLP

Defendant Attorney

BRADLEY & GMELICH LLP

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/24/2017: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: GREGORY JACK (Plaintiff); JAHMILAH JACK (Plaintiff); ASIM VANWAARDENBURG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketOSC - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/12/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketRequest for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketMOTION RULING ISSUED The Court finds the motion's reservation was cancelled by the defendant through the Court Reservation Management System on June 5, 2017. The matter is placed off calendar. The moving party is to give notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketMOTION RULING ISSUED The Court finds the motion's reservation was cancelled by the defendant through the Court Reservation Management System on June 5, 2017. The matter is placed off calendar. The moving party is to give notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketMOTION RULING ISSUED The Court finds the motion's reservation was cancelled by the defendant through the Court Reservation Management System on June 5, 2017. The matter is placed off calendar. The moving party is to give notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketMOTION RULING ISSUED The Court finds the motion's reservation was cancelled by the defendant through the Court Reservation Management System on June 5, 2017. The matter is placed off calendar. The moving party is to give notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketMOTION RULING ISSUED The Court finds the motion's reservation was cancelled by the defendant through the Court Reservation Management System on June 5, 2017. The matter is placed off calendar. The moving party is to give notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketMOTION RULING ISSUED The Court finds the motion's reservation was cancelled by the defendant through the Court Reservation Management System on June 5, 2017. The matter is placed off calendar. The moving party is to give notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketMOTION RULING ISSUED The Court finds the motion's reservation was cancelled by the defendant through the Court Reservation Management System on June 5, 2017. The matter is placed off calendar. The moving party is to give notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED - MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED - MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED - MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED - MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED - MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED - MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER RE: RECLASSIFICATION TO LIMITED JURISDICTION; MINUTE ORDER RE: RECLASSIFICATION TO LIMITED JURISDICTION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; NOTICE OF RULING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketTRANSFER/COORDINATION/CONSOLIDATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less