This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2020 at 03:31:51 (UTC).

JACK FAIGENBLAT VS DIEGO ARRIOLA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 JACK FAIGENBLAT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DIEGO ARRIOLA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5081

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FAIGENBLAT JACK

Defendants

ARRIOLA DIEGO

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

7/8/2020: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

3/17/2020: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

3/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

3/5/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/05/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

3/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/05/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

3/5/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/5/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/19/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/26/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

1/10/2020: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/10/2020

1/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/10/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/10/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

12/11/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Jack Faigenblat (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment: As To Parties changed from Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant) to Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 07/08/2020 ; Status Date changed from 03/05/2020 to 07/08/2020 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 07/08/2020 ; Status Date changed from 07/08/2020 to 07/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 07/08/2020 ; Status Date changed from 07/08/2020 to 07/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Jack Faigenblat on 12/11/2019 as follows: Defendant Diego Arriola does not owe the plaintiff Jack Faigenblat any money on plaintiff's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Jack Faigenblat against Defendant Los Angeles Unified School District on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Jack Faigenblat on 12/11/2019 for the principal amount of $597.98 and costs of $235.00 for a total of $832.98.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Jack Faigenblat (Plaintiff); As to: Diego Arriola (Defendant); Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/05/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/10/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 03/05/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Jack Faigenblat (Plaintiff); As to: Diego Arriola (Defendant); Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Jack Faigenblat (Plaintiff); As to: Diego Arriola (Defendant); Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less