This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2019 at 22:22:17 (UTC).

JACK ARTHUR WISHARD VS CHRISTOPHER MONROE

Case Summary

On 07/14/2016 JACK ARTHUR WISHARD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER MONROE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEVEN L. BERMAN and RONALD FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1374

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judges

STEVEN L. BERMAN

RONALD FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WISHARD JACK ARTHUR

Los Angeles, CA 90069

Defendant

MONROE CHRISTOPHER

Los Angeles, CA 90019

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - [Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

10/14/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - [Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

Notice - E-Filing Payment Due

7/14/2016: Notice - E-Filing Payment Due

Notice - E-Filing Acceptance

7/14/2016: Notice - E-Filing Acceptance

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/14/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

7/14/2016: Notice - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

9/8/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 09/08/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

9/8/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 09/08/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

9/8/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Rejection - REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL/HEARING

9/1/2016: Notice of Rejection - REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL/HEARING

Notice of Rejection

9/2/2016: Notice of Rejection

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/15/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

11/23/2016: Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

10/3/2016: Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

11/29/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2017
  • Case reassigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims); Signed and Filed by: As to: Christopher Monroe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Response to Request to Make Payments (Small Claims); Filed by: Jack Arthur Wishard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Request to Make Payments (Small Claims); Filed by: Christopher Monroe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Updated -- Notice of Rejection REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL/HEARING: Result: Result Date: 09/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 09/08/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2016
  • Notice of Rejection REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL/HEARING; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jack Arthur Wishard (Plaintiff); As to: Christopher Monroe (Defendant); Proof Of Mailing: No; Service Cost: 110.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: 1160715E4326 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2016
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1160715E4326 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Steven L. Berman at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/08/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Jack Arthur Wishard (Plaintiff); As to: Christopher Monroe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Acceptance; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.