This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2019 at 06:18:29 (UTC).

J SANTOS PRECIADO VS HANG TV VAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 J SANTOS PRECIADO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HANG TV VAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA MAY J. SANTOS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3902

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA MAY J. SANTOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRECIADO J SANTOS

Defendants

GALLOWAY TYRELL

EAN HOLDINGS LLC

VAN HANG TV

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

8/9/2018: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

10/15/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

12/20/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

12/20/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/7/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/7/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/8/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/15/2018

10/15/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/15/2018

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

10/15/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/9/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by J SANTOS PRECIADO on 08/09/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/08/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 05/08/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: EAN HOLDINGS LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/08/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by J SANTOS PRECIADO on 08/09/2018, entered Order for Dismissal with prejudice as to EAN HOLDINGS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/07/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 05/08/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT; Filed by: Clerk; As to: J SANTOS PRECIADO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/15/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 02/07/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/07/2019 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: EAN HOLDINGS LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/15/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/15/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 10/15/2018; Result Type to Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion; Result Type from Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: J SANTOS PRECIADO (Plaintiff); As to: HANG TV VAN (Defendant); TYRELL GALLOWAY (Defendant); EAN HOLDINGS LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/15/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less