This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2019 at 08:11:12 (UTC).

J R GROUP, INC. VS NONE

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 J R GROUP, INC filed an Other lawsuit against NONE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4463

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

J R GROUP INC.

Respondent

NONE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ZHAO JENNY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/21/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Reassignment) of 10/24/2019

10/24/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Reassignment) of 10/24/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment)

10/24/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment)

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

10/16/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Petition (name extension) - Petition Verified Petition For Order Reinstating J R Group, Inc. To Active Status

10/16/2019: Petition (name extension) - Petition Verified Petition For Order Reinstating J R Group, Inc. To Active Status

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

10/16/2019: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/16/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/16/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Entry of An Order Grantin...)

10/18/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Entry of An Order Grantin...)

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application For Entry of An Order Granting Verified Petition Reinstating J R Group, Inc. to Active Status

10/18/2019: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application For Entry of An Order Granting Verified Petition Reinstating J R Group, Inc. to Active Status

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Entry of An Order Grantin...) of 10/18/2019

10/18/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Entry of An Order Grantin...) of 10/18/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Reassignment) of 10/24/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketOn the Petition filed by J R Group, Inc. on 10/16/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by J R Group, Inc. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: J R Group, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: None (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application For Entry of An Order Granting Verified Petition Reinstating J R Group, Inc. to Active Status; Filed by: J R Group, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: J R Group, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Entry of An Order Grantin...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Entry of An Order Grantin...) of 10/18/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application For Entry of An Order Granting Verified Petition Reinstating J R Group, Inc. to Active Status scheduled for 10/18/2019 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 10/18/2019; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketHearing on Petition Verified Petition For Order Reinstating J R Group, Inc. To Active Status scheduled for 02/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application For Entry of An Order Granting Verified Petition Reinstating J R Group, Inc. to Active Status scheduled for 10/18/2019 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketHearing on Petition Verified Petition For Order Reinstating J R Group, Inc. To Active Status scheduled for 02/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketPetition Verified Petition For Order Reinstating J R Group, Inc. To Active Status; Filed by: J R Group, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: None (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: J R Group, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: None (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JR GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where None is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZHAO JENNY