This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2021 at 13:28:24 (UTC).

ISRAEL GONZALES, ET AL. VS MARY BUNEVACZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/03/2020 ISRAEL GONZALES filed an Other lawsuit against MARY BUNEVACZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9291

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SERRATO VERONICA

GONZALES CELESTE

GONZALES ISRAEL

Defendants

FLAWLESS VAPE WHOLESALE & DISTRIBUTION INC.

BUNEVACZ MARY

GRENCO SCIENCE INC.

LGDM LLC

LGDM LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

TABOLSKY ALEXANDER

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

11/3/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

7/28/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

7/28/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

7/28/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

7/28/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

7/28/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

7/28/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default - Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default

7/28/2021: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default - Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATES ON MOTIONS TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; DECLARATION OF ALEX TABOLSKY; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

8/10/2021: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATES ON MOTIONS TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; DECLARATION OF ALEX TABOLSKY; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARIN...)

8/12/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARIN...)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/9/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/27/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/27/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/27/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/27/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/29/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/29/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATES ON MOTIONS TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; DECLARATION OF ALEX TABOLSKY; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER: Filed By: Veronica Serrato (Plaintiff),Celeste Gonzales (Plaintiff),Israel Gonzales (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date: 08/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARIN...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATES ON MOTIONS TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; DECLARATION OF ALEX TABOLSKY; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER scheduled for 08/12/2021 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 08/12/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5) scheduled for 09/15/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 08/12/2021; Result Type to Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 11/29/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 08/12/2021; Result Type to Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 11/29/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 08/12/2021; Result Type to Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 11/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 08/12/2021; Result Type to Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 08/12/2021; Result Type to Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 08/12/2021; Result Type to Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5) scheduled for 09/15/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Israel Gonzales (Plaintiff); Veronica Serrato (Plaintiff); Celeste Gonzales (Plaintiff); As to: GRENCO SCIENCE, INC. (Defendant); Service Date: 11/12/2020; Service Cost: 150.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Israel Gonzales (Plaintiff); Veronica Serrato (Plaintiff); Celeste Gonzales (Plaintiff); As to: LGDM, LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/17/2020; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Israel Gonzales (Plaintiff); Veronica Serrato (Plaintiff); Celeste Gonzales (Plaintiff); As to: Mary Bunevacz (Defendant); GRENCO SCIENCE, INC. (Defendant); FLAWLESS VAPE WHOLESALE & DISTRIBUTION, INC. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Israel Gonzales (Plaintiff); Veronica Serrato (Plaintiff); Celeste Gonzales (Plaintiff); As to: Mary Bunevacz (Defendant); GRENCO SCIENCE, INC. (Defendant); FLAWLESS VAPE WHOLESALE & DISTRIBUTION, INC. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Israel Gonzales (Plaintiff); Veronica Serrato (Plaintiff); Celeste Gonzales (Plaintiff); As to: Mary Bunevacz (Defendant); GRENCO SCIENCE, INC. (Defendant); FLAWLESS VAPE WHOLESALE & DISTRIBUTION, INC. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b"

Case Number: 20STLC09291 Hearing Date: October 12, 2021 Dept: 20

Tentative Ruling

\r\n\r\n

Judge Kevin C. Brazile

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Department 20

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Hearing Date: Tuesday, October 12,\r\n2021

\r\n\r\n

Case Name: Gonzales, et al.\r\nv. Bunevacz, et al.

\r\n\r\n

Case No.: 20STLC09291

\r\n\r\n

Motion: Motions to Be\r\nRelieved as Counsel

\r\n\r\n

Moving Party: Farhad Novian and Alex Tabolsky\r\nof Novian & Novian, LLP (“Movants”)

\r\n\r\n

Responding Party: Defendants Flawless Vape\r\nWholesale & Distribution, Inc. dba Flawless Vape, Inc. and LGDM, LLC\r\n(“Responding Parties”)

\r\n\r\n

Notice: OK

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Ruling: The Motions\r\nto Be Relieved as Counsel are GRANTED.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Movants to give\r\nnotice and file a proof of service of the Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved\r\nas Counsel--Civil (Form MC-053) and this ruling.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

If counsel do not\r\nsubmit on the tentative, they are strongly encouraged to appear by\r\nLACourtConnect rather than in person due to the COVID-19 pandemic.

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

DISCUSSION

\r\n\r\n

Before the Court are three separate\r\nmotions to be relieved as counsel for each of the individual plaintiffs –\r\nIsrael Gonzales, Veronica Serrato, and Celeste Gonzales (collectively,\r\n“Plaintiffs”).

\r\n\r\n

Movants state that Plaintiffs have\r\nfailed to communicate with them, and that “irreconcilable differences” with\r\nPlaintiffs “have made it virtually impossible for [their] law firm to\r\neffectively represent” Plaintiffs. (Forms MC-052, ¶2.)

\r\n\r\n

Under California Rules of\r\nProfessional Conduct, Rule 1.16(b)(4), “a lawyer may withdraw from representing a client\r\nif: . . . the client . . . renders it unreasonably difficult for the lawyer to\r\ncarry out the representation effectively[.]”

\r\n\r\n

In addition, Movants have complied with the mandatory requirements of\r\nCalifornia Rules of Court, rule 3.1362. They\r\nsubmitted the required notices on Form MC-051, declarations on Form MC-052, and\r\nproposed orders on Form MC-053, and have shown service “on the client and on\r\nall other persons who have appeared in the case.”

\r\n\r\n

For\r\nthese reasons, the\r\nmotions to be relieved as counsel are GRANTED.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Responding Parties do not oppose Movants’\r\nwithdrawal, but request that Movants be ordered to provide Plaintiffs’ contact\r\ninformation “in order to be able to communicate with the Plaintiffs concerning\r\nthe present lawsuit, until such time as they retain new counsel.” (Response,\r\np.2.) The Court grants this request, but reminds Responding Parties of their\r\nduties under California Rules of Professional Conduct, Rule 4.3 (“Communicating\r\nwith an Unrepresented Person”).

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

CONCLUSION

\r\n\r\n

The Motions to Be Relieved as\r\nCounsel are GRANTED.

\r\n\r\n

Movants to give notice and file a\r\nproof of service of the Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel--Civil\r\n(Form MC-053) and this ruling.

\r\n\r\n

If counsel do not submit on the\r\ntentative, they are strongly encouraged to appear by LACourtConnect rather than\r\nin person due to the COVID-19 pandemic.

\r\n\r\n

"
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRENCO SCIENCE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FLAWLESS VAPE WHOLESALE & DISTRIBUTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TABOLSKY ALEXANDER