This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2016 at 09:21:13 (UTC).

ISLAND YACHT ANCHORAGE, INC. VS NEWSOM, GENTRY

Case Summary

On 03/15/2013 ISLAND YACHT ANCHORAGE, INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against NEWSOM, GENTRY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0269

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ISLAND YACHT ANCHORAGE INC.

Defendants

NEWSOM GENTRY

HENAGAN LISA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POOLE, KENNETH J

Defendant Attorneys

NEWSOM, GENTRY

HENAGAN, LISA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2013
  • RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. WRIT FULLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • NON-JURY TRIAL CONCLUDED - JUDGMENT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • NON-JURY TRIAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • FAILURE TO APPEAR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED- 1 HR(S) ,30 MIN(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2013
  • A/C - COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • A/C - COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less