This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2021 at 07:07:08 (UTC).

IRSA CUATRO VS JOSE MURALLES

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 IRSA CUATRO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSE MURALLES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7953

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CUATRO IRSA

Defendant

MURALLES JOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARNEY CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorney

ESMAILIAN ARPINE

 

Court Documents

Answer - Answer

11/19/2020: Answer - Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/3/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/21/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

9/21/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

9/21/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2023
  • Hearing09/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • Hearing03/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Jose Muralles (Defendant); As to: Irsa Cuatro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Irsa Cuatro (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Muralles (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/06/2020; Service Cost: 89.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Irsa Cuatro (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Muralles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Irsa Cuatro (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Muralles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Irsa Cuatro (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Muralles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARNEY CHRISTOPHER