This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2021 at 02:16:05 (UTC).

IRMA SEPULVEDA, ET AL. VS ANDRES RODRIGUEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/17/2020 IRMA SEPULVEDA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANDRES RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3469

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALARCON JOSEPH

SEPULVEDA IRMA

Defendants

CHUN YE YONG

RODRIGUEZ ANDRES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYAN JOSEPH DAVID

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/17/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/17/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/17/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

4/17/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [First Amended Standing Order, Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case]

5/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [First Amended Standing Order, Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case]

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/17/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

6/2/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint

5/29/2020: Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: PETITION FOR EXPEDITED APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE...) of 10/14/2021

10/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: PETITION FOR EXPEDITED APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE...) of 10/14/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: PETITION FOR EXPEDITED APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE...)

10/14/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: PETITION FOR EXPEDITED APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE...)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal As To Irma Sepulveda Only

10/12/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal As To Irma Sepulveda Only

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

9/22/2021: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

Petition (name extension) - Petition Supplemental Petition for Expedited Approval of Compromise of Claim or Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgement for Minor or Person with a Disability

11/12/2021: Petition (name extension) - Petition Supplemental Petition for Expedited Approval of Compromise of Claim or Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgement for Minor or Person with a Disability

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise)

11/15/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise) of 11/15/2021

11/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise) of 11/15/2021

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2023
  • Hearing04/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • Hearing01/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise) of 11/15/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketHearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise scheduled for 11/15/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 11/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketPetition Supplemental Petition for Expedited Approval of Compromise of Claim or Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgement for Minor or Person with a Disability; Filed by: Joseph Alarcon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketHearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise scheduled for 11/15/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: PETITION FOR EXPEDITED APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: PETITION FOR EXPEDITED APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE...) of 10/14/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [First Amended Standing Order, Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- First Amended Standing Order: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Irma Sepulveda (Plaintiff); Joseph Alarcon (Plaintiff); As to: Andres Rodriguez (Defendant); Yong Chun Ye (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Irma Sepulveda (Plaintiff); Joseph Alarcon (Plaintiff); As to: Andres Rodriguez (Defendant); Yong Chun Ye (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Irma Sepulveda (Plaintiff); Joseph Alarcon (Plaintiff); As to: Andres Rodriguez (Defendant); Yong Chun Ye (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 20STLC03469 Hearing Date: November 15, 2021 Dept: 25

PROCEEDINGS: PETITION\r\nFOR EXPEDITED APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE OF CLAIM OR ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF\r\nPROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

MOVING PARTY: Petitioner Irma Sepulveda on behalf of minor Claimant\r\nJoseph Alarcon

\r\n\r\n

RESP. PARTY: None

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

PETITION TO APPROVE MINOR’S COMPROMISE

\r\n\r\n

(CCP § 372, CRC, rule 7.950.5)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

TENTATIVE RULING:

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

The Petition\r\nfor Expedited Approval of Compromise of Claim or Action or Disposition of\r\nProceeds of Judgment for Minor is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

SERVICE: \r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

[ \r\n ] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule\r\n3.1300) NO

\r\n\r\n

[ \r\n ] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) NO

\r\n\r\n

[ \r\n ] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c,\r\n1005(b)) NO

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

OPPOSITION: None filed as of November\r\n10, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

\r\n\r\n

REPLY: None filed as\r\nof November 10, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

ANALYSIS:

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

I. \r\nBackground\r\n& Discussion

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

On\r\nApril 17, 2020, Plaintiffs Irma Sepulveda (“Petitioner”) and minor Joseph\r\nAlarcon (“Claimant”) filed an action against Defendants Andres Rodriguez\r\n(“Rodriguez”) and Yong Chun Ye (“Ye”) (collectively, “Defendants”). Plaintiffs\r\nfiled a First Amended Complaint (the “FAC”) on May 29, 2020. Petitioner was\r\nappointed Claimant’s guardian ad litem on June 2, 2020. (6/2/20 Order.)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Petitioner\r\nfiled the instant Petition for Expedited Approval of Compromise of Claim or\r\nAction or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor (the “Petition”) on\r\nSeptember 22, 2021.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

On\r\nOctober 14, the Court noted several issues with the Petition. (10/14/21 Minute\r\nOrder.) The Court set the matter for hearing, requested supplemental papers\r\naddressing the noted errors, and warned that failure to obey the Court’s order\r\ncould result in the Petition being placed off calendar or denied. (Id.)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

To\r\ndate, no supplemental papers have been filed. Accordingly, the Petition is\r\nPLACED OFF CALENDAR.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

II. \r\nConclusion\r\n& Order

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

For the foregoing reasons, the Petition for Expedited Approval of\r\nCompromise of Claim or Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor\r\nis PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Petitioner is ordered to give notice.

'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN JOSEPH DAVID