This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2020 at 02:28:00 (UTC).

IRENE EATON VS KINDER 4 RESCUE, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 IRENE EATON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KINDER 4 RESCUE, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5082

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EATON IRENE

Defendants

LYLE AND ELIZABETH COLLINS TRUST COLLINS TRUST

KINDER4RESCUE INC.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice OF REMOTE APPEARANCES AND EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL]

8/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice OF REMOTE APPEARANCES AND EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

9/18/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/18/2020

9/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/18/2020

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

9/18/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

6/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/11/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/11/2020

5/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/11/2020

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

3/9/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/9/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/09/2020

3/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/09/2020

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/24/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/14/2020

1/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/14/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/14/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

1/14/2020: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

1/2/2020: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

12/20/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/6/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Kinder4Rescue Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Irene Eaton on 12/20/2019 as follows: Defendant Kinder4Rescue Inc. does not owe the plaintiff Irene Eaton any money on plaintiff's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/18/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 09/18/2020; Result Type to Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketNotice OF REMOTE APPEARANCES AND EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Irene Eaton (Plaintiff); Kinder4Rescue Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice OF REMOTE APPEARANCES AND EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Irene Eaton (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • Docket** Case Name changed from IRENE EATON vs LYLE AND ELIZABETH COLLINS TRUST COLLINS TRUST to IRENE EATON vs KINDER 4 RESCUE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Irene Eaton (Plaintiff); As to: Kinder4Rescue Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Kinder4Rescue Inc. (Defendant) to Kinder4Rescue Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketRequest for Accommodations by Persons with Disabilities and Response; Filed by: Irene Eaton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Irene Eaton (Plaintiff); As to: Lyle and Elizabeth Collins Trust Collins Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Irene Eaton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Irene Eaton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less