This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2019 at 14:46:15 (UTC).

INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC VS IBARRA, CESAR

Case Summary

On 06/06/2016 INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against IBARRA, CESAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSEPH R. PORRAS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9181

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOSEPH R. PORRAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC

Defendants

IBARRA CESAR

PERALTA IRMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THE LAW OFFICE OF DANIEL CARVO - DANIEL JOHN CARVO

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF DANIEL CARVO

CARVO DANIEL JOHN

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

8/21/2017: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2017
  • Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk; County: LOS ANGELES; Principal: 9,345.70; Interest: 513.24; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC) (Plaintiff); As to: CESAR IBARRA (Defendant); IRMA PERALTA (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 513.24; Credits: 2,450.00; Service Date: 08/15/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • CASE FILE RECEIVED FROM DOWNEY COURTHOUSE AT NORWALK COURTHOUSE EM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. RECEIPT # NOR512560075 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DOWNEY COURTHOUSE RE: PROCESSING WRITS AND ABSTRACTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • COURT ORDERS DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 11/14/16 . FOR (INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC) . AGAINST (IBARRA, CESAR) , (PERALTA, IRMA) . PRINCIPAL $ 7558.64 . ATTORNEY FEES $ 543.51 . INTEREST $ 898.55 . COSTS $ 345.00 . TOTAL $ 9,345.70 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO KIM TRAN RE: COURT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2016
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (IBARRA, CESAR) , (PERALTA, IRMA) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1-10 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • DECLARATION RE: LOST ORIGINAL CONTRACT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 585(D) CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET & ADDENDUM; FILED. SERVED AS TO (PERALTA, IRMA) SUBSERVED BY LEAVING WITH JOSE VARELA ON 07/07/16 . COSTS OF $ 60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET & ADDENDUM; FILED. SERVED AS TO (IBARRA, CESAR) SUBSERVED BY LEAVING WITH 07/07/16 . COSTS OF $ 60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR265476093. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 05/22/19 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEY . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY JOSEPH R. PORRAS, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less