This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2019 at 00:37:51 (UTC).

INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC VS ALVAREZ, JOSE ANTONIO

Case Summary

On 12/16/2016 INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALVAREZ, JOSE ANTONIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4074

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC

Defendants

ALVAREZ JOSE ANTONIO AKA ALVAREZ ANTONIOAKA FLORES JOSE A AKA FLORES

ALVAREZ JOSE ANTONIO AKA ALVAREZ ANTONIO AKA FLORES JOSE A AKA FLORES JOSE ALLEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THE LAW OFFICE OF DANIEL CARVO - DANIEL JOHN CARVO

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF DANIEL CARVO

CARVO DANIEL JOHN

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

1/14/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

Declaration (name extension) - for lost original document

3/26/2018: Declaration (name extension) - for lost original document

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

3/26/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/26/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

11/8/2017: Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

Notice of Entry of Judgment

6/11/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Request for Dismissal

3/26/2018: Request for Dismissal

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

8/28/2017: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/28/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

8/28/2017: Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - of Tessie Saich for entry of judgment ccp 585; ccp 1033

3/26/2018: Declaration (name extension) - of Tessie Saich for entry of judgment ccp 585; ccp 1033

Declaration (name extension) - In support of request to enter Default Judgment [CCP 585, 1033, 1788.50-64

8/28/2017: Declaration (name extension) - In support of request to enter Default Judgment [CCP 585, 1033, 1788.50-64

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

12/11/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Order (name extension) - to Accept Copies in Lieu of Original

5/24/2018: Order (name extension) - to Accept Copies in Lieu of Original

Declaration (name extension) - Re: Original Documents and/or Lost Instrument and Order

8/28/2017: Declaration (name extension) - Re: Original Documents and/or Lost Instrument and Order

Judgment

5/24/2018: Judgment

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2019
  • Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: (INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC) (Plaintiff); As to: JOSE ANTONIO ALVAREZ (Defendant); County: LOS ANGELES; Principal: 13018.94; Interest: 709.50; Costs: 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC) (Plaintiff); As to: JOSE ANTONIO ALVAREZ (Defendant); Costs: 135.00; Interest: 709.50; Service Date: 12/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: (INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Updated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment: Status Date changed from 06/25/2018 to 06/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 12/02/2019 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Order to Accept Copies in Lieu of Original; Signed and Filed by: (INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff (INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC) against Defendant (ALVAREZ, JOSE ANTONIO) AKA (ALVAREZ, ANTONIO), AKA (FLORES JOSE ALLEN), AKA (FLORES, JOSE A) on the Complaint filed by INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC on 12/16/2016 for damages of $11,654.32, attorney fees of $739.62, and costs of $490.00 for a total of $12,883.94.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: (INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC) (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2017
  • On the Complaint filed by INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC on 12/16/2016, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: (INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Declaration Re: Original Documents and/or Lost Instrument and Order; Filed by: (INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, STATEMENT OF LOCATION, COVER SHEET, ADDENDUM FILED. SERVED AS TO (ALVAREZ, JOSE ANTONIO) AKA (ALVAREZ, A NTONIO)AKA (FLORES, JOSE A) AKA (FLORES , JOSE ALLEN) SUB SERVED ON 1/18/17 BY LEAVING WITH (EMILIA ROJAS) EX-WIFE . COSTS OF $ 60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET & ADDENDUM; GENERAL ORDER; EXHIBITS RETURNED NOT FOUND/NO SERVICE AS TO (ALVAREZ, JOSE ANTONIO) AKA (ALVAREZ, A NTONIO)AKA (FLORES, JOSE A) AKA (FLORES , JOSE ALLEN) FILED. COSTS OF $ 60.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 12/02/19 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEY . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455371019. Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less