Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/08/2020 at 21:21:06 (UTC).

INVESERVE CORPORATION VS ERIC YEUNG

Case Summary

On 09/30/2019 INVESERVE CORPORATION filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ERIC YEUNG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. DODSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2893

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM D. DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INVESERVE CORPORATION

Defendant

YEUNG ERIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRENNAN MICHAEL A.

 

Court Documents

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

9/30/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Complaint - Complaint

9/30/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/30/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/30/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Eric Yeung)

10/1/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Eric Yeung)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

10/1/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/9/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Answer - Answer

10/9/2019: Answer - Answer

Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial - Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

10/17/2019: Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial - Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial - Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

10/17/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial - Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/17/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order - Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

10/28/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order - Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Unlawful Detainer Stipulation and Judgment - Unlawful Detainer Stipulation and Judgment

10/28/2019: Unlawful Detainer Stipulation and Judgment - Unlawful Detainer Stipulation and Judgment

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/28/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

10/28/2019: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale - Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

10/31/2019: Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale - Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

10/31/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

11/19/2019: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution: Filed By: Inveserve Corporation (Plaintiff); Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied); Clerk; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale; Filed by: Inveserve Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution; Issued by: Inveserve Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Eric Yeung (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketStipulated judgment entered for Plaintiff Inveserve Corporation against Defendant Eric Yeung on the Complaint filed by Inveserve Corporation on 09/30/2019 for holdover damages $1,183.84, attorney fees of $500.00, and costs of $390.00 for a total of $2,073.84.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 1415 S MARENGO AVE #C, ALHAMBRA, CA 91803 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.; Writ to issue forthwith, but no lockout prior to 11/12/2019.; See written stipulation for further terms and conditions.; Written stipulation filed and copy of stipulation given/mailed to each party.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Stipulation and Judgment; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Eric Yeung (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/28/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department R updated: Result Date to 10/28/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/09/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Inveserve Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by Inveserve Corporation on 09/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketRequest/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial; Filed by: Inveserve Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Eric Yeung (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Inveserve Corporation (Plaintiff); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/06/2019; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Inveserve Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Eric Yeung (Defendant); Service Date: 10/06/2019; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/28/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer Trial; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Eric Yeung (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Eric Yeung (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INVESERVE INC. (DOE 2) is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRENNAN MICHAEL . A