This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2021 at 07:53:09 (UTC).

INTERVENTIONAL SPINE CARE AND ORTHOPEDIC REGENERATIVE EXPERTS VS LUIS F. CISNEROS

Case Summary

On 12/23/2020 INTERVENTIONAL SPINE CARE AND ORTHOPEDIC REGENERATIVE EXPERTS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LUIS F CISNEROS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0657

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERVENTIONAL SPINE CARE AND ORTHOPEDIC REGENERATIVE EXPERTS

Defendant

CISNEROS LUIS F.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVINE ZACHARY

Defendant Attorney

PANAH SETAREH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/23/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

12/23/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/23/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/23/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

12/23/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - Answer

4/5/2021: Answer - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2023
  • Hearing12/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • Hearing06/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Luis F. Cisneros (Defendant); As to: Interventional Spine Care and Orthopedic Regenerative Experts (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Interventional Spine Care and Orthopedic Regenerative Experts (Plaintiff); As to: Luis F. Cisneros (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/15/2021; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Interventional Spine Care and Orthopedic Regenerative Experts (Plaintiff); As to: Luis F. Cisneros (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Interventional Spine Care and Orthopedic Regenerative Experts (Plaintiff); As to: Luis F. Cisneros (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Interventional Spine Care and Orthopedic Regenerative Experts (Plaintiff); As to: Luis F. Cisneros (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERVENTIONAL SPINE CARE AND ORTHOPEDIC REGENERATIVE EXPERTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PANAH SETAREH ESQ