This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 22:45:27 (UTC).

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB VS GT RIDE, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/29/2018 INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GT RIDE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5209

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB

Defendant

GT RIDE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCLAIN DEBORAH LORRAINE

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/23/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/20/2018: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

12/20/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

12/20/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

12/20/2018: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/20/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

12/20/2018: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Judgment - Judgment

3/15/2019: Judgment - Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

3/22/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Summons - on Complaint

3/29/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/29/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/29/2018: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

5/25/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/29/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff); As to: GT Ride, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/26/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club against Defendant GT Ride, LLC on the Complaint filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club on 03/29/2018 for damages of $5,000.00, interest of $212.92, and costs of $289.00 for a total of $5,501.92.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment: Filed By: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff); As to: GT Ride, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketDefault entered as to GT Ride, LLC; On the Complaint filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club on 03/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff); As to: GT Ride, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff); As to: GT Ride, LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 05/10/2018; Service Cost: 64.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/26/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff); As to: GT Ride, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GT RIDE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCLAIN DEBORAH LORRAINE