This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/01/2021 at 00:15:16 (UTC).

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB VS ERIC THOMAS FLORENCE

Case Summary

On 09/20/2018 INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ERIC THOMAS FLORENCE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2003

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB

Defendant

FLORENCE ERIC THOMAS

Valencia, CA 91355

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCLAIN DEBORAH LORRAINE

 

Court Documents

Statement of the Case - Statement of the Case

3/29/2021: Statement of the Case - Statement of the Case

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 03/30/2021

3/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 03/30/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

3/30/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/27/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/30/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)

9/24/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted) of 09/24/2019

9/24/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted) of 09/24/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)

11/21/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

12/4/2019: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/16/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order Plaintiff's Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted and [Proposed] Order

7/30/2019: Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order Plaintiff's Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted and [Proposed] Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/30/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/21/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Answer - Answer

12/21/2018: Answer - Answer

Complaint

9/20/2018: Complaint

Summons - on Complaint

9/20/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/20/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/20/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • Hearing05/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 03/30/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 05/18/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketStatement of the Case; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketWitness List; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketExhibit List; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/23/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Eric Thomas Florence (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Eric Thomas Florence (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff); As to: Eric Thomas Florence (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/16/2018; Service Cost: 138.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff); As to: Eric Thomas Florence (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC12003    Hearing Date: November 21, 2019    Dept: 94

MOTION TO DEEM THE TRUTH OF MATTERS IN REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT AS ADMITTED AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

(CCP § 2033.280)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club’s Motion to Deem the Truth of Matters Specified in Requests for Admissions to Defendant as Admitted and for Monetary Sanctions is GRANTED.

ANALYSIS:

I. Background

On February 8, 2019, Plaintiff Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (“Plaintiff”) served Requests for Admissions on Defendant Eric Thomas Florence (“Defendant”). (Aguirre Decl. ¶ 4, citing to Exh. A.) To date, Plaintiff has not received any discovery responses to the propounded discovery requests from Defendant. (Id. ¶ 9.) As a result, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Deem the Truth of Matters Specified in Requests for Admissions to Defendant as Admitted and for Monetary Sanctions (the “Motion”) on July 30, 2019.

II. Discussion & Order

 

Because Defendant has failed to serve any responses to Plaintiff’s Requests for Admissions, the unopposed Motion is GRANTED. Pursuant to CCP § 2033.280, the truth of the matters specified in Plaintiff’s Requests for Admissions to Defendant is hereby deemed admitted.

Because the Motion has been granted, monetary sanctions are mandatory under CCP § 2033.280(c). Given the simplicity of the Motion and the lack of opposition and reply, the Court awards Plaintiff $430 in reasonable attorney’s fees and costs as monetary sanctions against Defendant. Sanctions are to be paid within thirty (30) days from the date of Plaintiff serving a notice of this Order on Defendant.

Prevailing party is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SMCdept94@lacourt.org as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion will be placed off calendar.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCLAIN DEBORAH LORRAINE