Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/06/2021 at 02:40:21 (UTC).

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB VS EDGAR FLORES

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against EDGAR FLORES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3859

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB

Defendant

FLORES EDGAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAINES TODD FREDERICK

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

3/4/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination - Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

3/18/2020: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination - Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Order for Continuance/Setting of Judgment Debtor Examination - Order for Continuance/Setting of Judgment Debtor Examination

7/13/2020: Order for Continuance/Setting of Judgment Debtor Examination - Order for Continuance/Setting of Judgment Debtor Examination

Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment (plus Certified Judgment) - Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment

1/24/2019: Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment (plus Certified Judgment) - Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/8/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/8/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration (name extension) - Interest

6/15/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Interest

Declaration (name extension) - CCP 585(D)

6/15/2018: Declaration (name extension) - CCP 585(D)

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

6/15/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal

6/15/2018: Request for Dismissal

Judgment

6/15/2018: Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - CCP 1033

6/15/2018: Declaration (name extension) - CCP 1033

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/5/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Summons - on Complaint

11/13/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/13/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/13/2017: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/13/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketHearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 03/04/2021 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 03/04/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketOrder for Continuance/Setting of Judgment Debtor Examination; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 08/12/2020 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 03/04/2021 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 26 - Hon. Serena R. Murillo; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketHearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 08/12/2020 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff); As to: Edgar Flores (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 07/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 03/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment; Issued by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff); As to: Edgar Flores (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff); As to: Edgar Flores (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/22/18; Service Cost: 161.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff); As to: Edgar Flores (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/13/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAINES TODD FREDERICK