This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 04:26:20 (UTC).

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURNACE EXCHANGE VS KAREN CELESTE FLORES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/29/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURNACE EXCHANGE against KAREN CELESTE FLORES in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7695

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB AN INTERINSURNACE EXCHANGE

Defendants

JIMENEZ REYES RUIZ

FLORES KAREN CELESTE

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/29/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

5/29/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Complaint

5/29/2018: Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/2/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/2/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/27/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

12/6/2018: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/6/2018: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Frank Mendoza

12/6/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Frank Mendoza

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

12/6/2018: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Deborah L. McClain...Several

12/6/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Deborah L. McClain...Several

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Deborah L. McClain...Individual

12/6/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Deborah L. McClain...Individual

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration for Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585(d)

12/6/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration for Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585(d)

Application (name extension) - Application Request for Court Judgment

12/6/2018: Application (name extension) - Application Request for Court Judgment

Judgment - Judgment

2/13/2019: Judgment - Judgment

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/29/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurnace exchange against Defendant Karen Celeste Flores on the Complaint filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurnace exchange on 05/29/2018 for the principal amount of $12,547.75, interest of $424.53, and costs of $570.00 for a total of $13,542.28, joint and several.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurnace exchange against Defendant Reyes Ruiz Jimenez on the Complaint filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurnace exchange on 05/29/2018 for the principal amount of $5,000.00, interest of $169.17, and costs of $570.00 for a total of $5,739.17, joint and several.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurnace exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurnace exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/26/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment: Filed By: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurnace exchange (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 02/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment: Filed By: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurnace exchange (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 02/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 94 - Hon. James E. Blancarte; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration for Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585(d); Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurnace exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketDefault entered as to Karen Celeste Flores; Reyes Ruiz Jimenez; On the Complaint filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurnace exchange on 05/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurnace exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Karen Celeste Flores (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/11/2018; Service Cost: 100.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurnace exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Reyes Ruiz Jimenez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/11/2018; Service Cost: 100.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/26/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurnace exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Karen Celeste Flores (Defendant); Reyes Ruiz Jimenez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurnace exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC07695    Hearing Date: January 14, 2020    Dept: 94

MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT

(CCP §§ 473(b), 187)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC’s Motion to Vacate Judgment is DENIED.  

ANALYSIS:

I. Background

On May 29, 2018, Plaintiff Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for subrogation against Defendants Karen Celeste Flores (“Flores”) and Reyes Ruiz Jimenez (“Jimenez”) (collectively, “Defendants”). On August 27, 2018, default was entered against both Defendants. On February 13, 2019, default judgment was entered against both Defendants.

On November 13, 2019, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Set Aside Default and Default Judgment (the “Motion”).

II. Legal Standard & Discussion

Plaintiff seeks to set aside default and default judgment against Judgment Jimenez

1. CCP 473(b)

Plaintiff argues that default and default judgment against Defendant Jimenez may be set aside based on the Plaintiff’s counsel’s affidavit of fault. (Mot., p. 3.) Specifically, counsel states she mistakenly believed Defendant Jimenez was the registered owner of the vehicle involved in the accident underlying the subrogation action, and through her “mistake inadvertence, surprise, and/or excusable neglect,” a Request for Entry of Default and Request for Default Judgment were filed with the Court. (Mot., McClain Decl., ¶ 4, 5.) In support, she cites Code of Civil Procedure, section 473, subdivisions (a), (b), and (d). However, only section (b) applies to motions to set aside based on attorney fault.

Code of Civil Procedure section 473, in pertinent part:

(Code Civ. Proc., § 473(b).) (Italics added.)         

However, relief under this section is appropriate only for parties against whom a default or default judgment has been entered (i.e., a defendant). Thus, Code of Civil Procedure section 473, subdivision (b) is inapplicable here.

2. CCP 187

Code of Civil Procedure section 187 grants to every court the power to use all means to carry its jurisdiction into effect, even if those processes are not set out in the code. “When jurisdiction is, by the Constitution or this Code, or by any other statute, conferred on a Court or judicial officer, all the means necessary to carry it into effect are also given; and in the exercise of this jurisdiction, if the course of proceeding be not specifically pointed out by this Code or the statute, any suitable process or mode of proceeding may be adopted which may appear most conformable to the spirit of this code.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 187.)

Here, Plaintiff cites section 187 and concludes that the Court has the authority to set aside default and default judgment and enter grant Plaintiff’s request to dismiss Defendant Jimenez. (Mot., p. 4.) However, Plaintiff doesn’t cite any other supporting authority demonstrating that section 187 grants the Courts the power to set aside default and default judgment and thereafter dismiss a judgment debtor.

III. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC’s Motion to Vacate Judgment is DENIED.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SMCdept94@lacourt.org as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion will be placed off calendar.